Ormerod et al v. Prince George's County, Maryland
Plaintiff: Stephanie A Bunce, Jennifer M Lawhorne, Aaron R Tyler, Charles D Lisko, Rafael Wells, Timothy K Ormerod, Brandon M Goff, Christopher L Lynge, Andi I Villasenor, William A Murray, Michael W Shackelford, Kristerpher C Jones, Leonard F. Collins and Justin M Shea
Defendant: Prince George's County, Maryland
Case Number: 8:2020cv01864
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan for Mediation. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/7/2020. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER. As discussed at the August 7, 2020 Case Management Conference, discovery is stayed pending mediation before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. The parties are ORDERED to file a Joint Status Report not later than 14 days after the conclusion of mediation. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs' local counsel, Megan Kathleen Mechak, is excused from all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/7/2020. (nrs, Chambers)
August 7, 2020 Filing 18 Case Management Conference held on 8/7/2020 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang. (FTR - Derro - 4C) (tds, Deputy Clerk)
August 5, 2020 Filing 17 Request for Pre-Motion Conference on Plaintiffs' Consent Motion to Excuse Presence of Counsel for Plaintiffs Pursuant to Local Rule 101.1(b) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Consent Motion to Excuse Presence of Counsel for Plaintiffs Pursuant to Local Rule 101.1(b) and Memorandum in Support Thereof, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Mechak, Megan)
July 27, 2020 Filing 16 Settlement Conference - requesting (Belton Gofreed, Tonia)
July 22, 2020 Filing 15 PAPERLESS NOTICE. A RULE 16 CONFERENCE is scheduled for August 7, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. To join the call at the scheduled time: (1) Dial 1-888-557-8511. (2) Enter access code 3008173, followed by the # key. You will then be placed on hold until Chambers dials into the call, at which point you will be prompted to enter a security code. (3) When prompted, enter security code 08070930 followed by the # key. The call will be recorded, so please do not use speakerphones as they compromise sound quality. Also, we ask that parties not remain on the conference line after the Judge has left the call, to ensure that the line is free for other calls that may be on the Judge's calendar. The parties are reminded that they should be prepared to address whether they consent to have all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge and whether they wish to participate in a mediation session with a Magistrate Judge, whether before, during, or after discovery. Parties are expected to consult with their clients and confer with each other on these issues in advance of the Rule 16 Case Management Conference and, if possible, present joint views to the Court. (sb3s, Chambers)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 12/4/2020. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/22/2020. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Prince George's County, Maryland.(Belton Gofreed, Tonia)
July 10, 2020 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Prince George's County, Maryland (Belton Gofreed, Tonia)
July 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Tonia Yvetta Belton Gofreed on behalf of All Defendants (Belton Gofreed, Tonia)
July 6, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rafael Wells, Andi I Villasenor, Kristerpher C Jones, Michael W Shackelford, Brandon M Goff, Stephanie A Bunce, Leonard F. Collins, Christopher L Lynge, Charles D Lisko, Timothy K Ormerod, Justin M Shea, Jennifer M Lawhorne, William A Murray, Aaron R Tyler. All Defendants.(Stewart, John)
July 6, 2020 Filing 9 QC NOTICE: #8 Affidavit of Service, filed by Brandon M Goff, Aaron R Tyler, Timothy K Ormerod, Christopher L Lynge, Stephanie A Bunce, Michael W Shackelford, Jennifer M Lawhorne, Leonard F. Collins, Kristerpher C Jones, Rafael Wells, Justin M Shea, Charles D Lisko, Andi I Villasenor, William A Murray was filed incorrectly. **Wrong event used. Please re-file documents by selecting Service of Process Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 [FILED IN ERROR] AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, and Case Management Order served on Prince George's County, Maryland c/o Angela D. Alsobrooks, Chief Executive Officer on 6/25/20, filed by Stephanie A Bunce, Leonard F. Collins, Brandon M Goff, Kristerpher C Jones, Jennifer M Lawhorne, Charles D Lisko, Christopher L Lynge, William A Murray, Timothy K Ormerod, Michael W Shackelford, Justin M Shea, Aaron R Tyler, Andi I Villasenor, Rafael Wells.(Stewart, John) Modified on 7/6/2020 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk).
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John Welling Stewart. Directing attorney John Welling Stewart to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/23/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Sara Faulman. Directing attorney Sara Faulman to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/23/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 6/22/2020. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John Welling Stewart (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8712968.) by Timothy K Ormerod(Mechak, Megan)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sara L. Faulman (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8712944.) by Timothy K Ormerod (Attachments: #1 Attachment - US Court Admissions)(Mechak, Megan)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Prince George's County, Maryland.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2020 Case reassigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Judge Richard D. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8710971.), filed by Timothy K Ormerod. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Sue Forms, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment A to Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Mechak, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ormerod et al v. Prince George's County, Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie A Bunce
Represented By: Megan Kathleen Mechak
Represented By: Sara Faulman
Represented By: John Welling Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer M Lawhorne
Represented By: Megan Kathleen Mechak
Represented By: Sara Faulman
Represented By: John Welling Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron R Tyler
Represented By: Megan Kathleen Mechak
Represented By: Sara Faulman
Represented By: John Welling Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles D Lisko
Represented By: Megan Kathleen Mechak
Represented By: Sara Faulman
Represented By: John Welling Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Wells
Represented By: Megan Kathleen Mechak
Represented By: Sara Faulman
Represented By: John Welling Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy K Ormerod
Represented By: Megan Kathleen Mechak
Represented By: Sara Faulman
Represented By: John Welling Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon M Goff
Represented By: Megan Kathleen Mechak
Represented By: Sara Faulman
Represented By: John Welling Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher L Lynge
Represented By: Megan Kathleen Mechak
Represented By: Sara Faulman
Represented By: John Welling Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andi I Villasenor
Represented By: Megan Kathleen Mechak
Represented By: Sara Faulman
Represented By: John Welling Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A Murray
Represented By: Megan Kathleen Mechak
Represented By: Sara Faulman
Represented By: John Welling Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W Shackelford
Represented By: Megan Kathleen Mechak
Represented By: Sara Faulman
Represented By: John Welling Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristerpher C Jones
Represented By: Megan Kathleen Mechak
Represented By: Sara Faulman
Represented By: John Welling Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard F. Collins
Represented By: Megan Kathleen Mechak
Represented By: Sara Faulman
Represented By: John Welling Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin M Shea
Represented By: Megan Kathleen Mechak
Represented By: Sara Faulman
Represented By: John Welling Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prince George's County, Maryland
Represented By: Tonia Yvetta Belton Gofreed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?