Doe v. Center for Vein Restoration (MD), LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Center for Vein Restoration (MD), LLC and Sanjiv Lakhanpal, MD
Petitioner: United States of America
Case Number: 8:2020cv01943
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Filing 56 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-05736. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 7/2/2020 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO THE DISTRICT OF MARYLAND. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 5/18/20. 5/18/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(mbh, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE, PLEASE TAKE NOTE THAT THE HEARING IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE SCHEDULED FOR NOVEMBER 15, 2019 AT 11:00 A.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND IN ROOM 14614, UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA,PA 19106 IS CANCELED.(rt)
November 7, 2019 Filing 53 Discovery Plan by CENTER FOR VEIN RESTORATION (MD), LLC, SANJIV LAKHANPAL.(MUSTOKOFF, MICHAEL)
September 26, 2019 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion re #44 MOTION for Order, #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Improper Venue, or to Transfer Venue Response to Relator's Notice of Supplemental Authority #51 filed by CENTER FOR VEIN RESTORATION (MD), LLC, SANJIV LAKHANPAL. (MUSTOKOFF, MICHAEL)
September 23, 2019 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Improper Venue, or to Transfer Venue Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by JANE DOE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A)(MCCORMICK, BRIAN)
September 17, 2019 Filing 50 SUR-REPLY in Opposition re #44 MOTION for Order, #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Improper Venue, or to Transfer Venue filed by CENTER FOR VEIN RESTORATION (MD), LLC, SANJIV LAKHANPAL. Certificate of Service. (SWICHAR, JONATHAN) Modified on 9/18/2019 (lisad, ).
September 10, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Hearing: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/15/2019 11:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND.(rt)
September 10, 2019 Filing 48 RESPONSE in Opposition re #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Improper Venue, or to Transfer Venue Sur-Reply and Reply Brief ISO Cross Motion filed by JANE DOE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MCCORMICK, BRIAN)
September 9, 2019 Filing 47 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL REMOVE THIS MATTER FROM THE CIVIL SUSPENSE DOCKET.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 9/9/2019. 9/10/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
September 3, 2019 Filing 46 REPLY in Support re #44 MOTION for Order and Response in Opposition to Cross-Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by CENTER FOR VEIN RESTORATION (MD), LLC, SANJIV LAKHANPAL. (MUSTOKOFF, MICHAEL) Modified on 9/4/2019 (fb).
August 20, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT S. BERGER, JR on behalf of JANE DOE (BERGER, SCOTT)
August 19, 2019 Filing 44 RESPONSE in Opposition re #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Improper Venue, or to Transfer Venue and CROSS-MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by JANE DOE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit C, #12 Exhibit D)(MCCORMICK, BRIAN) Modified on 8/20/2019 (fb).
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE PARTIES' STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (DOC. NO. #42 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE PARTIES' STIPULATION (DOC. NO. #42 ) IS APPROVED AND ADOPTED IN PART AS FOLLOWS: 1. PLAINTIFF SHALL RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, OR ALTERNATIVELY, TO TRANSFER VENUE (DOC. NO. #41 ) NO LATER THAN AUGUST 19, 2019; AND 2. DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE A REPLY NO LATER THAN SEPTEMBER 3, 2019.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 7/25/2019. 7/25/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
July 25, 2019 Filing 42 STIPULATION and Consent Order for Extension of Time to Respond/Reply by CENTER FOR VEIN RESTORATION (MD), LLC, SANJIV LAKHANPAL. (SWICHAR, JONATHAN)
July 22, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Improper Venue, or to Transfer Venue filed by CENTER FOR VEIN RESTORATION (MD), LLC, SANJIV LAKHANPAL.Certificate of Service, Memorandum, Declaration. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Dr. Lakhanpal, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Dr. Lakhanpal, #4 Declaration of T. Serra, #5 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of T. Serra)(MUSTOKOFF, MICHAEL)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS APPLICATIONS FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JAMES R. RAVITZ, ESQUIRE, SHARI FLEISHMAN ESFAHANI, ESQUIRE, LEO P. CUNNINGHAM, ESQUIRE, AND G. THEODORE SERRA, ESQUIRE (Doc. Nos. #35 , #36 , #37 , #38 ) ARE GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 7/18/2019.7/22/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. ECF APPS MAILED.(sg, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 39 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CENTER FOR VEIN RESTORATION (MD), LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SWICHAR, JONATHAN)
July 18, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of G. Theodore Serra ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13678872.) filed by CENTER FOR VEIN RESTORATION (MD), LLC, SANJIV LAKHANPAL.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application Form)(SWICHAR, JONATHAN)
July 18, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Leo P. Cunningham ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13678866.) filed by CENTER FOR VEIN RESTORATION (MD), LLC, SANJIV LAKHANPAL.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application Form)(SWICHAR, JONATHAN)
July 18, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Admission of Shari Fleishman Esfahani ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13678847.) filed by CENTER FOR VEIN RESTORATION (MD), LLC, SANJIV LAKHANPAL.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application Form)(SWICHAR, JONATHAN)
July 18, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of James R. Ravitz ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13678819.) filed by CENTER FOR VEIN RESTORATION (MD), LLC, SANJIV LAKHANPAL.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application Form)(SWICHAR, JONATHAN)
July 16, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDRA R. WALEKO on behalf of CENTER FOR VEIN RESTORATION (MD), LLC, SANJIV LAKHANPAL with Certificate of Service(WALEKO, ALEXANDRA)
July 16, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL M. MUSTOKOFF on behalf of CENTER FOR VEIN RESTORATION (MD), LLC, SANJIV LAKHANPAL with Certificate of Service(MUSTOKOFF, MICHAEL)
July 16, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN L. SWICHAR on behalf of CENTER FOR VEIN RESTORATION (MD), LLC, SANJIV LAKHANPAL with Certificate of Service(SWICHAR, JONATHAN)
June 5, 2019 Filing 31 Letter from Lauren G. Aranguren, Deputy Attorney General (State of New Jersey) addressed to the Honorable Paul S. Diamond dated 4/22/19 (mbh, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 30 Letter from Kimberly M. Bolton, Assistant Attorney General (Commonwealth of Virginia) addressed to the Honorable Paul S. Diamond dated 4/17/19. (mbh, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 29 Letter from Raja Mishra, Assistant Attorney General (State of Maryland) addressed to the Honorable Paul S. Diamond dated 4/15/19. (mbh, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 28 Letter from Hillary G. Chapman, Special Assistant Attorney General (State of New York) addressed to the Honorable Paul S. Diamond dated 4/11/19 (mbh, ).
June 5, 2019 Filing 27 Letter from Mark E. Mader, Deputy Attorney General (State of Indiana) addressed to the Honorable Paul S. Diamond dated 4/10/19. (mbh, ).
May 28, 2019 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JANE DOE. SANJIV LAKHANPAL waiver sent on 5/23/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (MCCORMICK, BRIAN)
May 28, 2019 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JANE DOE. CENTER FOR VEIN RESTORATION (MD), LLC waiver sent on 5/23/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (MCCORMICK, BRIAN)
April 22, 2019 Filing 24 Letter from Kimberly M. Bolton, Assistant Attorney General addressed to Honorable Paul S. Diamond dated 4/17/19. (mbh, )
March 27, 2019 Summons Issued as to CENTER FOR VEIN RESTORATION (MD), LLC, SANJIV LAKHANPAL. Forwarded To: Mailed to Counsel on 03/28/2019 (nd, )
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER AS FOLLOWS: THE AMENDED COMPLAINT SHALL BE UNSEALED AND SERVED UPON DEFTS BY THE RELATOR; ALL OTHER CONTENTS OF THE COURT'S FILE IN THIS ACTION SHALL REMAIN UNDER SEAL AND SHALL NOT BE MADE PUBLIC OR SERVED UPON THE DEFTS OR THE RELATOR, EXCEPT FOR THIS ORDER AND THE "UNITED STATES' NOTICE THAT IT IS NOT INTERVENING AT THIS TIME," WHICH THE RELATOR WILL SERVE UPON DEFTS ONLY AFTER SERVICE OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT; THE SEAL SHALL BE LIFTED AS TO ALL OTHER MATTERS OCCURRING IN THIS ACTION AFTER 3/25/2019, ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 3/25/19. 3/27/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(fb)
March 25, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA of Non-Intervention, Certificate of Service. (fb)
July 19, 2018 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against CENTER FOR VEIN RESTORATION (MD), LLC, SANJIV LAKHANPAL, filed by JANE DOE.(fb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Center for Vein Restoration (MD), LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Center for Vein Restoration (MD), LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanjiv Lakhanpal, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?