Housing Rights Initiative et al v. Bozzuto Management Company et al
Plaintiff: Housing Rights Initiative and Neuhtah Opiotennione
Defendant: JBG Smith Management Services, LLC, Berkshire Communities, LLC, Pinnacle Campus Living LLC, Tower Construction Group, LLC, Bozzuto Management Company, Wood Residential Services, LLC, Fairfield Residential Company LLC, Kettler Management Inc., Vantage Management, Inc. and Greystar Management Services L.P.
Case Number: 8:2020cv01956
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981hs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for W. Christian Moffitt (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8833474.) by Kettler Management Inc.(Morgan, Sharon)
August 27, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Oras Morgan on behalf of Kettler Management Inc. (Morgan, Sharon)
August 7, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Neuhtah Opiotennione, Housing Rights Initiative. Vantage Management, Inc. waiver sent on 7/8/2020, answer due 9/8/2020.(Handley, Matthew)
August 7, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Neuhtah Opiotennione, Housing Rights Initiative. Wood Residential Services, LLC waiver sent on 7/8/2020, answer due 9/8/2020.(Handley, Matthew)
August 6, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Neuhtah Opiotennione, Housing Rights Initiative. Berkshire Communities, LLC waiver sent on 7/8/2020, answer due 9/8/2020.(Handley, Matthew)
August 5, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Neuhtah Opiotennione, Housing Rights Initiative. Pinnacle Campus Living LLC waiver sent on 7/8/2020, answer due 9/8/2020.(Handley, Matthew)
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Neuhtah Opiotennione, Housing Rights Initiative. Greystar Management Services L.P. waiver sent on 7/8/2020, answer due 9/8/2020.(Handley, Matthew)
July 31, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Neuhtah Opiotennione, Housing Rights Initiative. JBG Smith Management Services, LLC waiver sent on 7/8/2020, answer due 9/8/2020.(Handley, Matthew)
July 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn Estes Calkins on behalf of Bozzuto Management Company (Calkins, Lynn)
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas John Gartner on behalf of Greystar Management Services L.P. (Gartner, Thomas)
July 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Marc Moore on behalf of Greystar Management Services L.P. (Moore, Matthew)
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Neuhtah Opiotennione, Housing Rights Initiative. Fairfield Residential Company LLC waiver sent on 7/8/2020, answer due 9/8/2020.(Handley, Matthew)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Neuhtah Opiotennione, Housing Rights Initiative. Bozzuto Management Company waiver sent on 7/8/2020, answer due 9/8/2020.(Handley, Matthew)
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Neuhtah Opiotennione, Housing Rights Initiative. Tower Construction Group, LLC waiver sent on 7/8/2020, answer due 9/8/2020.(Handley, Matthew)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Neuhtah Opiotennione, Housing Rights Initiative. Kettler Management Inc. waiver sent on 7/8/2020, answer due 9/8/2020.(Handley, Matthew)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Pontone on behalf of Berkshire Communities, LLC (Pontone, Kathleen)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Elisabeth Koloup Hall on behalf of Berkshire Communities, LLC (Hall, Elisabeth)
July 6, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Berkshire Communities, LLC, Bozzuto Management Company, Fairfield Residential Company LLC, Greystar Management Services L.P., JBG Smith Management Services, LLC, Kettler Management Inc., Pinnacle Campus Living LLC, Tower Construction Group, LLC, Vantage Management, Inc., Wood Residential Services, LLC.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Berkshire Communities, LLC, Bozzuto Management Company, Fairfield Residential Company LLC, Greystar Management Services L.P., JBG Smith Management Services, LLC, Kettler Management Inc., Pinnacle Campus Living LLC, Tower Construction Group, LLC, Vantage Management, Inc., Wood Residential Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8732553.), filed by Neuhtah Opiotennione, Housing Rights Initiative. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Examples of Advertisements), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Bozzuto, #4 Summons Greystar, #5 Summons Berkshire, #6 Summons JBG Smith, #7 Summons Kettler, #8 Summons Pinnacle, #9 Summons Vantage, #10 Summons Tower, #11 Summons Wood, #12 Summons Fairfield)(Handley, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Housing Rights Initiative et al v. Bozzuto Management Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Housing Rights Initiative
Represented By: Matthew Keith Handley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neuhtah Opiotennione
Represented By: Matthew Keith Handley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBG Smith Management Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Communities, LLC
Represented By: Kathleen Pontone
Represented By: Elisabeth Koloup Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Campus Living LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tower Construction Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bozzuto Management Company
Represented By: Lynn Estes Calkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wood Residential Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfield Residential Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kettler Management Inc.
Represented By: Sharon Oras Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vantage Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystar Management Services L.P.
Represented By: Thomas John Gartner
Represented By: Matthew Marc Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?