Guevara v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Guevara
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Equifax Information Services, Llc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv02066
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Reza, Syed)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #7 consent motion for extension of time. Experian Information Solution, Inc's response to Plaintiff's complaint is now due by September 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 8/10/2020. (Chasanow, Deborah)
August 7, 2020 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc for Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Reza, Syed)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reza, Syed)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sandra Guevara. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020.(Kelly, Kristi)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #3 consent motion for extension of time. Equifax Information Services, LLC's response to Plaintiff's complaint is now due by September 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 8/3/2020. (Chasanow, Deborah)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, Llc. identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, Llc..(Appel, Renee)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, Llc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Appel, Renee)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Equifax Information Services, Llc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8754444.), filed by Sandra Guevara. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Equifax Information Services, LLC, #3 Summons for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.)(Kelly, Kristi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guevara v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Syed Mohsin Reza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, Llc.
Represented By: Renee Beth Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Guevara
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?