Alberti v. Bolduc et al
Plaintiff: Tabitha T. Alberti
Defendant: Jennifer H Bolduc and Samuel J Bolduc
Case Number: 8:2020cv02083
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING #16 Stipulation of Dismissal. This case is dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear its own costs, unless otherwise agreed. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/20/2020. (imws, Chambers)
August 20, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Jennifer H Bolduc, Samuel J Bolduc(Risk, David)
August 14, 2020 Filing 15 Local Rule 103.5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Risk, David)
July 23, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by David Francis Risk on behalf of All Defendants (Risk, David)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Initial Discovery Protocols)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER ORDER scheduling a Rule 16 telephone conference call on 8/24/2020 at 1:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/20/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 1/18/2021. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/20/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/20/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/17/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (7-8) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY, MARYLAND. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #7 Complaint by Jennifer H Bolduc, Samuel J Bolduc.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Jennifer H Bolduc, Samuel J Bolduc, filed by Tabitha T. Alberti.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 Correspondence re: Defendants' Response to the Standing Order Concerning Removal (McCarron, Thomas)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Jennifer H Bolduc (McCarron, Thomas)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Samuel J Bolduc (McCarron, Thomas)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Jennifer H Bolduc, Samuel J Bolduc /Notice to Adverse Party (McCarron, Thomas)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.5 Statement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Summons, #2 Exhibit 1A Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1B Order Granting, #4 Exhibit 2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit 3 Answer(McCarron, Thomas) Modified on 7/17/2020 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk).
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, case number CAL20-07072. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8758405), filed by Jennifer H Bolduc, Samuel J Bolduc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCarron, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alberti v. Bolduc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer H Bolduc
Represented By: Thomas Vincent McCarron
Represented By: David Francis Risk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel J Bolduc
Represented By: Thomas Vincent McCarron
Represented By: David Francis Risk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabitha T. Alberti
Represented By: Patrick G Senftle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?