DeMedeiros et al v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ricardo DeMedeiros and Eliane DeMedeiros
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Equifax Information Services, LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv02155
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 14 Trans Union, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union, LLC.(Schuckit, Robert)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint; Experian shall respond on or by October 5, 2020. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/20/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc for Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Reza, Syed)
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reza, Syed)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 10/8/2020. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/19/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Appel, Renee)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Appel, Renee)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricardo DeMedeiros, Eliane DeMedeiros. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 7/31/2020, answer due 8/21/2020.(Kelly, Kristi)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ricardo DeMedeiros, Eliane DeMedeiros. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020.(Kelly, Kristi)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Trans Union, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC.(Schuckit, Robert)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Schuckit on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (Schuckit, Robert)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LETTER ORDER Regarding the filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/27/2020. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8770659.), filed by Ricardo DeMedeiros, Eliane DeMedeiros. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Trans Union, LLC, #3 Summons for Experian Information Solutions, Inc., #4 Summons for Equifax Information Services, LLC)(Kelly, Kristi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeMedeiros et al v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo DeMedeiros
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliane DeMedeiros
Represented By: Kristi Cahoon Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Robert J. Schuckit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Syed Mohsin Reza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Renee Beth Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?