Metague v. Woodbolt Distribution LLC
Plaintiff: Daniel Metague
Defendant: Woodbolt Distribution LLC doing business as Nutrabolt
Case Number: 8:2020cv02186
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Deceptive Trade Practices
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 PAPERLESS ORDER directing the parties to (1) submit a Joint Status Report or (2) submit a Joint Proposed Scheduling Order for Class Action Settlement that incorporates the milestones required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(e), no later than August 5, 2022. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 7/6/2022. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STATUS REPORT [Joint] by Woodbolt Distribution LLC(Kasdan, Ira)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PAPERLESS ORDER directing the parties to (1) submit a Joint Status Report or (2) submit a Joint Proposed Scheduling Order for Class Action Settlement that incorporates the milestones required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(e) within 48 hours. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 7/5/2022. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 PAPERLESS ORDER directing the parties to (1) submit a Joint Status Report or (2) submit a Joint Proposed Scheduling Order for Class Action Settlement that incorporates the milestones required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(e), no later than June 21, 2022. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 5/18/2022. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Telephone Conference held on 5/18/2022 before Judge Paula Xinis.(FTR - Ulander - 2C.) (bus, Deputy Clerk)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PAPERLESS ORDER: A recorded call has been scheduled for May 18, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. Instructions will be emailed to the parties. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 5/11/2022. (tb2s, Chambers)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STATUS REPORT - Joint by Daniel Metague(Migliaccio, Nicholas)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Woodbolt Distribution LLC(Kasdan, Ira)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PAPERLESS ORDER granting the extension of STAY requested at #47 Status Report. All discovery and pretrial deadlines, including Plaintiffs deadline to respond to Defendants pending #32 Motion for Reconsideration are STAYED until May 8, 2022 so that the parties may conduct ongoing settlement negotiations. The parties are DIRECTED to file a Joint Status Report no later than April 8, 2022. If appropriate, the parties are DIRECTED to file a supplemental Joint Status Report no later than May 8, 2022. The parties are forewarned that, absent truly extraordinary circumstances, the Court will not extend the stay period beyond May 8, 2022.. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 3/16/2022. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STATUS REPORT - Joint by Daniel Metague(Migliaccio, Nicholas)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Ira T Kasdan on behalf of Woodbolt Distribution LLC (Kasdan, Ira)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PAPERLESS ORDER granting the extension of STAY requested at #44 Status Report. All discovery and pretrial deadlines, including Plaintiffs deadline to respond to Defendants pending #32 Motion for Reconsideration are STAYED until February 24, 2022 so that the parties may conduct ongoing settlement negotiations. The parties are DIRECTED to file a Joint Status Report no later than February 24, 2022. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 1/31/2022. (tb2s, Chambers)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Woodbolt Distribution LLC(Stern, Bezalel)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 PAPERLESS ORDER granting the extension of STAY requested at #42 Status Report. All discovery and pretrial deadlines, including Plaintiffs deadline to respond to Defendants pending #32 Motion for Reconsideration are STAYED until January 24, 2022 so that the parties may conduct ongoing settlement negotiations. The parties are DIRECTED to file a Joint Status Report no later than January 24, 2022. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 12/28/2021. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Daniel Metague(Migliaccio, Nicholas)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Renewed Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 10/28/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Joint MOTION to Stay -Renewed by Daniel Metague (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Migliaccio, Nicholas)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 PAPERLESS ORDER Granting #37 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 10/19/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 (STRICKEN BY CHAMBERS) LETTER ORDER Granting #37 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 10/7/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/19/2021 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Woodbolt Distribution LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Confidentiality Order)(Stern, Bezalel)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #31 Motion, ADOPTING Stipulated Scheduling Order, nunc pro tunc June 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 7/30/2021. (tb2s, Chambers)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order Granting Joint Motion to Stay Case. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 7/27/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Joint MOTION to Stay by Woodbolt Distribution LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Bezalel)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint by Woodbolt Distribution LLC.(Stern, Bezalel)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Reconsideration re #24 Memorandum Opinion, #25 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, by Woodbolt Distribution LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Bezalel)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Scheduling Order by Woodbolt Distribution LLC(Stern, Bezalel)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Telephone Conference held on 6/24/2021 before Judge Paula Xinis.(FTR - Singletary - 2A) (ts2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PAPERLESS ORDER directing the parties to submit a proposed joint scheduling order by no later than July 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 6/24/2021. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PAPERLESS NOTICE: The recorded call set for June 23, 2021 has been RESCHEDULED to June 24, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. Parties should follow instructions previously provided. (tb2s, Chambers)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Geoffrey Castello. Directing attorney Geoffrey Castello to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/22/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Geoffrey Castello (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9338876.) by Woodbolt Distribution LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- List of Court Admissions Information)(Stern, Bezalel)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #19 Motion to Dismiss; deferring Plaintiff's request for leave to amend the Amended Complaint; status conference scheduled for Wednesday, June 23, 2021 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 6/16/2021. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 6/16/2021. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Woodbolt Distribution LLC.(Stern, Bezalel)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Daniel Metague.(Migliaccio, Nicholas)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #20 Motion for Extension of Time. Response to #19 Motion to Dismiss is due April 5, 2021; Reply due May 3, 2021. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 3/25/2021. (tb2s, Chambers)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss by Daniel Metague(Migliaccio, Nicholas)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Woodbolt Distribution LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Bezalel)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Woodbolt Distribution, LLC, d/b/a Nutrabolts shallfile its Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint on or before February 26, 2021; Response is due on or before March 26, 2021; Reply due on or before April 9, 2021. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 2/10/2021. (tb2s, Chambers)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time by Woodbolt Distribution LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Bezalel)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Woodbolt Distribution LLC, filed by Daniel Metague. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redlined Amended Complaint)(Migliaccio, Nicholas)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 QC NOTICE: needs to be corrected. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. The following corrective actions are needed regarding missing or incomplete information: **Redline copy has not been filed. Please re-file the clean version of the amended complaint as the main document and the redline version as an attachment to the amended complaint. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (FILED IN ERROR) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Woodbolt Distribution LLC, filed by Daniel Metague.(Migliaccio, Nicholas) Modified on 1/28/2021 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's Response to #10 MOTION to Dismiss is extended to January 27, 2021. Reply is due February 17, 2021. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 1/15/2021. (tb2s, Chambers)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Daniel Metague (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Migliaccio, Nicholas)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Woodbolt Distribution LLC (Stern, Bezalel)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Woodbolt Distribution LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Bezalel)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its Answer or otherwise Response to the Complaint on or before December 14, 2020. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 11/10/2020. (tb2s, Chambers)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Woodbolt Distribution LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Bezalel)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Woodbolt Distribution, LLC on 10/22/2020, filed by Daniel Metague.(Rihn, Daniel)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Robert A Mackey. Directing attorney Robert A Mackey to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/4/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert A. Mackey (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8843139.) by Daniel Metague(Migliaccio, Nicholas)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Daniel Aaron Rihn. Directing attorney Daniel Aaron Rihn to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/10/2020. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel Aaron Rihn (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8794520.) by Daniel Metague(Migliaccio, Nicholas)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Woodbolt Distribution LLC.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Woodbolt Distribution LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8777395.), filed by Daniel Metague. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Migliaccio, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metague v. Woodbolt Distribution LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Metague
Represented By: Nicholas A Migliaccio
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Rihn
Represented By: Robert Allen Mackey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodbolt Distribution LLC doing business as Nutrabolt
Represented By: Bezalel A. Stern
Represented By: Geoffrey Castello
Represented By: Ira T Kasdan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?