Alston v. Fulton Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Candace E. Alston
Defendant: The Columbia Bank and Fulton Bank National Association
Case Number: 8:2020cv02212
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint Amended by Fulton Bank National Association, The Columbia Bank.(Kaplan, Adam)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by Fulton Bank National Association (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Adam)
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Candace E. Alston, filed by Candace E. Alston. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Redline Version of Amended Complaint)(Styles, Jeffrey)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Candace E. Alston re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Styles, Jeffrey)
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey W Styles on behalf of Candace E. Alston (Styles, Jeffrey)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Fulton Bank National Association, The Columbia Bank re #3 Standing Order Concerning Removal (Kaplan, Adam)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Fulton Bank National Association, The Columbia Bank (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kaplan, Adam)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Fulton Bank National Association, The Columbia Bank (Kaplan, Adam)
July 30, 2020 Filing 4 Removal Notification Letter (c/m 7/30/2020 - dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 7/30/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY, MARYLAND. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Fulton Bank National Association, The Columbia Bank, filed by Candace E. Alston.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2020 Deficiency Notice -Defendants- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 8/6/2020 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, Maryland, case number CAL2012434. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8780712), filed by Fulton Bank National Association, The Columbia Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit State Court Docket, #4 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Kaplan, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alston v. Fulton Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Columbia Bank
Represented By: Adam Marc Kaplan
Represented By: Eric M Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulton Bank National Association
Represented By: Adam Marc Kaplan
Represented By: Eric M Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace E. Alston
Represented By: Jeffrey W Styles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?