Lewis v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Keisha D. Lewis
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 8:2020cv02253
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Referring Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/25/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2020 Case Reassigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Judge Paul W. Grimm no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
September 21, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Pre-Motion Conference re #5 Complaint (Koch, Rebecca)
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Keisha D. Lewis. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #6 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by United States of America.(Koch, Rebecca)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by United States of America concerning Related Cases (Koch, Rebecca)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/6/2020. (c/m 8/6/2020 - dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/6/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 6, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY, MARYLAND. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT (As filed in state court) against United States of America, filed by Keisha D. Lewis.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/5/2020. (c/m 8/5/2020 - dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Koch, Rebecca)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.5 Filing of State Court Papers(Koch, Rebecca)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Maryland for Prince Georges County, case number CAL-20-12009., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Complaint as filed in State Court, #4 Civil Case Information Sheet as filed in State Court, #5 Address Information, #6 Self Representation Plaintiff Information Packet, #7 Summons as to Hur as filed in State Court)(Koch, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keisha D. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?