Neal v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Andrea Neal
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC and Procollect, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv02323
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Andrea Neal (Siddons, Michael)
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Andrea Neal (Siddons, Michael)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax Information Services, LLC by Andrea Neal (Siddons, Michael)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement as to ProCollect, Inc., only by Andrea Neal (Siddons, Michael)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrea Neal. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 8/14/2020, answer due 9/4/2020.(Siddons, Michael)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrea Neal. Procollect, Inc. served on 8/14/2020, answer due 9/4/2020.(Siddons, Michael)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Procollect, Inc..(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Andrea Neal (Siddons, Michael)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Procollect, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8802660.), filed by Andrea Neal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Siddons, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neal v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Procollect, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Neal
Represented By: Michael Alan Siddons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?