Bawa v. Newrez LLC
Trustee: Rebecca A. Herr
Appellee: Newrez LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing as Servicing Agent for the Bank of New York Mellon FKA The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of CWALT, Inc., Alternative Loan Trust
Appellant: Harmeet Bawa
Case Number: 8:2020cv02326
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 Bankruptcy Letter to Counsel regarding briefs. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
September 8, 2020 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (kns, Deputy Clerk)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 APPELLANT'S DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal from U.S. Bankruptcy Court by Harmeet Bawa re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal; Appellant Brief due by 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 BK #1 Voluntary Petition, #2 BK #2 Certificate of Credit Counseling, #3 BK #4 Verification of Creditor Matrix, #4 BK #6 Creditor Request for Notices filed by Synchrony Bank, #5 BK #7 Notice re Meeting of Creditors, #6 BK #8 Notice of Deadline for Filing Missing Documents, #7 BK #9 Order Directing Debtor's Counsel to Comply with Local Bankruptcy Rule 2016-1(b), #8 BK #10 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #9 BK #11 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #10 BK #12 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor, #11 BK #13 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #12 BK #14 Motion to Extend Time to File Missing Documents, #13 BK #15 Notice and Order Granting Motion to Extend Time, #14 BK #16 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #15 BK #17 Amended Notice re Meeting of Creditors, #16 BK #17-1 Notice re Telephonic Meeting, #17 BK #18 Schedule A/B, #18 BK #19 Schedule C, #19 BK #20 Schedule D, #20 BK #21 Schedule E/F, #21 BK #22 Schedule G, #22 BK #23 Schedule H, #23 BK #24 Schedule I, #24 BK #25 Schedule J, #25 BK #26 Statement of Financial Affairs, #26 BK #27 Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules, #27 BK #28 Chapter 13 Plan, #28 BK #29 Deficiency Notice, #29 BK #30 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #30 BK #31 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #31 BK #32 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #32 BK #33 Amended Chapter 13 Plan, #33 BK #34 Objection to Chapter 13 Plan - WITHDRAWN - SEE BK #74, #34 BK #35 Order to Show Cause - DISSOLVED BY FILINGS ON 4/29/2020 & 5/7/2020, #35 BK #36 Meeting of Creditors Held Open for attorney certification, #36 BK #37 Summary of Assets and Liabilities, #37 BK #38 Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period for 3 Years, #38 BK #39 Statement of Financial Affairs, #39 BK #40 Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules, #40 BK #41 Certificate of Service, #41 BK #42 Deficiency Notice, #42 BK #43 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #43 BK #44 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #44 BK #45 Amended Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period for 3 Years, #45 BK #46 Pre Conference Certification, #46 BK #47 Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions, #47 BK #47-1 Proposed Order, #48 BK #48 Objection to Claim No. 10 - DISREGARD - REDOCKETED AT BK #49, #49 BK #49 Objection to Claim No. 10, #50 BK #50 Order Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan with Leave to Amend, #51 BK #51 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #52 BK #52 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management, #53 BK #53 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #54 BK #54 Response to Objection to Claim, #55 BK #55 Notice of Hearing, #56 BK #56 Order Sustaining Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions, #57 BK #57 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #58 BK #58 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #59 BK #59 Response to Objection to Claim and Supplement to Objection to Claim, #60 BK #60 Response to Supplemental Objection to Claim, #61 BK #61 Personal Financial Management Course Certificate, #62 BK #62 Second Amended Chapter 13 Plan, #63 BK #64 Order Denying Objection to Claim No. 10, #64 BK #65 Request for Notices by Kohl's, Inc., #65 BK #66 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #66 BK #67 Notice of Appeal, #67 BK #69 Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal, #68 BK #70 Initial Transmittal of Notice of Appeal, #69 BK #70-1 Order, #70 BK #70-2 Docket Sheet, #71 BK #70-3 Transmittal Sheet, #72 BK #71 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #73 BK #72 Order Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan with Leave to Amend, #74 BK #73 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #75 BK #74 Withdrawal of BK # 34 Objection to Confirmation of Plan, #76 Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses and Charges, #77 Docket Sheet, #78 Transmittal Sheet)(kns, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2020: #79 Social Security Number Verification Page) (kns, Deputy Clerk).
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Newrez LLC (Hillman, Robert)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert H Hillman on behalf of Newrez LLC (Hillman, Robert)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT of Chapter 13 Trustee by Rebecca A. Herr(Nix, Frederick)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick Eric Nix on behalf of Rebecca A. Herr (Nix, Frederick)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (Greenbelt). Bankruptcy Court case number 20-12962 TJC, filed by Harmeet Bawa. (Attachments: #1 Order Being Appealed, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Transmittal Sheet)(kns, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bawa v. Newrez LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Rebecca A. Herr
Represented By: Rebecca Herr
Represented By: Frederick Eric Nix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Newrez LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing as Servicing Agent for the Bank of New York Mellon FKA The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of CWALT, Inc., Alternative Loan Trust
Represented By: Michael T Freeman
Represented By: Robert H Hillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Harmeet Bawa
Represented By: Kosmas Nicholas Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?