Barsir v. Manor Care of Potomac MD, LLC
Appellee: Manor Care of Potomac MD, LLC
Appellant: Aletha K. Barsir
Trustee: Michael G. Wolff
Case Number: 8:2020cv02327
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 Appellee's BRIEF by Manor Care of Potomac MD, LLC.(Rudow, William)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal from U.S. Bankruptcy Court by Aletha K. Barsir re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Attachments: #1 BK# 125 Amended Schedules filed: Schedule C, #2 BK# 125-1 Declaration re Schedules, #3 BK# 125-2 Certificate of Service, #4 BK# 140 Amended Schedules filed: Schedule AB, Schedule C, #5 BK# 140-1 Schedule C, #6 BK# 140-2 Certificate of Service, #7 BK# 140-3 Declaration, #8 BK# 142 Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions, #9 BK# 142-1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #10 BK# 142-2 Exhibit, #11 BK# 142-3 Proposed Order, #12 BK# 143 Support Document Exhibit 2, #13 BK# 149 Response on behalf of Aletha K Barsir, #14 BK# 149-1 Exhibit 1 - docketed amended Sched, #15 BK# 149-2 Proposed Order, #16 BK# 151 Opposition Response on behalf of Manor Care of Potomac MD, LLC, #17 BK# 156 Amended Schedules filed: Schedule AB, Schedule C, #18 BK# 157 Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions, #19 BK# 157-1 Proposed Order, #20 BK# 175 Response on behalf of Aletha K Barsir, #21 BK# 175-1 Proposed Order, #22 BK# 180 Order Granting Creditor's Third Partial Objection to Amended Exemption Re Retirement Account, #23 BK# 188 Notice of Appeal to District Court re Order granting Manor Care's Third Partial Objection to Amended Exemption, #24 BK# 199 Appellant Designation of Contents For Inclusion in Record On Appeal, #25 Docket Sheet, #26 Supplemental Transmittal)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 27, 2020 Filing 4 Appellant's BRIEF by Aletha K. Barsir. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Valle, Diana)
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time re filing appeal brief and appendix by Aletha K. Barsir (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-certificate of death, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Valle, Diana)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal - NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. (Greenbelt). Bankruptcy Court case number 19-15518,, filed by Aletha K. Barsir. (Attachments: #1 Order Being Appealed, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Transmittal Sheet)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barsir v. Manor Care of Potomac MD, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Manor Care of Potomac MD, LLC
Represented By: William M Rudow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Aletha K. Barsir
Represented By: Diana Carolina Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Michael G. Wolff
Represented By: Michael G Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?