Palazzo v. Bayview Loan Servicing LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ruben Palazzo
Defendant: Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company and Bayview Loan Servicing LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv02392
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Ruben Palazzo.(Robinson, Phillip)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company, Bayview Loan Servicing LLC.(Loomba, Namrata)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PAPERLESS ORDER re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Ruben Palazzo. Defendants are directed to file a response to this motion by September 9, 2020. The response should be 10 pages or less, excluding any exhibits, commensurate with the length of Plaintiff's motion. Plaintiff may then file a reply of 5 pages or less, excluding any exhibits, by September 30, 2020. The parties are directed to please highlight relevant material in any exhibits. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/27/2020.(pk3s, Chambers)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/27/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Ruben Palazzo. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Transmittal Sheet)(kns, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2020: #3 AP #56 Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings on Plaintiff's Motion for Withdrawal of Reference, #4 AP #56-1 Exhibit 1, #5 AP #56-2 Memorandum in Support, #6 AP #56-3 Proposed Order) (kns, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palazzo v. Bayview Loan Servicing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company
Represented By: Namrata Loomba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Edward Win-Teh Chang
Represented By: Namrata Loomba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Palazzo
Represented By: Phillip R Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?