SMACNA Mid-Atlantic Sheet Metal Industry Fund & the Trustees Thereof v. KG Sheet Metal Services, LLC
Plaintiff: SMACNA Mid-Atlantic Sheet Metal Industry Fund & the Trustees Thereof
Defendant: KG Sheet Metal Services, LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv02414
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal; dismissing with prejudice this action; directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/29/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SMACNA Mid-Atlantic Sheet Metal Industry Fund & the Trustees Thereof (Fletcher, Robert)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SMACNA Mid-Atlantic Sheet Metal Industry Fund & the Trustees Thereof. KG Sheet Metal Services, LLC served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020.(Fletcher, Robert)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT (CORRECTED) against KG Sheet Metal Services, LLC, filed by SMACNA Mid-Atlantic Sheet Metal Industry Fund & the Trustees Thereof.(Fletcher, Robert)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 8/24/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to KG Sheet Metal Services, LLC.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by SMACNA Mid-Atlantic Sheet Metal Industry Fund & the Trustees Thereof (Fletcher, Robert)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KG Sheet Metal Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8818809.), filed by SMACNA Mid-Atlantic Sheet Metal Industry Fund & the Trustees Thereof. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Fletcher, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMACNA Mid-Atlantic Sheet Metal Industry Fund & the Trustees Thereof v. KG Sheet Metal Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KG Sheet Metal Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMACNA Mid-Atlantic Sheet Metal Industry Fund & the Trustees Thereof
Represented By: Robert P Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?