Tejera v. Mariam, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Juan Tejera
Defendant: Mariam, Inc. and DARCARS Automotive Group
Case Number: 8:2020cv02434
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan for Settlement. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 9/14/2020. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE re #12 Scheduling Order filed by DARCARS Automotive Group, Mariam, Inc..(Henderson, Charles)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 1/14/2021. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 9/1/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #5 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Mariam, Inc..(Henderson, Charles)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Mariam, Inc..(Henderson, Charles)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.5(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Henderson, Charles)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John Paul Lynch on behalf of DARCARS Automotive Group, Mariam, Inc. (Lynch, John)
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by DARCARS Automotive Group, Mariam, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, Civil Cover Sheet (Henderson, Charles)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Mariam, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent DARCARS Automotive Group for Mariam, Inc..(Henderson, Charles)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 8/25/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 Deficiency Notice -DARCARS Automotive Group and Mariam, Inc.- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 9/1/2020 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by DARCARS Automotive Group, Mariam, Inc. was filed incompletely. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Civil Cover Sheet. To correct this problem, file the Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) and link the Civil Cover Sheet to #1 . (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 25, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR MONTGOMERY COUNTY, MARYLAND. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against DARCARS Automotive Group, Mariam, Inc., filed by Juan Tejera.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Montgomery County, Maryland, case number 482375-V. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8824068), filed by Mariam, Inc., DARCARS Automotive Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Writ of Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of New Case Number, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A - Scheduling Order, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A - Order for Mandatory Settlement Conference, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A - Scheduling Notice and Order of Court, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A - Administrative Notice, #8 Exhibit Exhibit A - Civil Case Information Report, #9 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Service)(Henderson, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tejera v. Mariam, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariam, Inc.
Represented By: Charles H Henderson
Represented By: John Paul Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARCARS Automotive Group
Represented By: Charles H Henderson
Represented By: John Paul Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Tejera
Represented By: Jason Shafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?