Cooke v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Gloria Cooke
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 8:2020cv02663
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimin THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Gloria Cooke. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lobato, Quinn)
October 27, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimin THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Esposito, Tonya)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER finding as moot #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 10/19/2020. (Hazel, George) Modified on 10/20/2020 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk).
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gloria Cooke, filed by Gloria Cooke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lobato, Quinn)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Esposito, Tonya)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Statement Regarding Removal (Esposito, Tonya)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Esposito, Tonya)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 9/15/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2020 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY, MARYLAND. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed by Gloria Cooke.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, case number CAL20-13592. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8862741), filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1 - Writ of Summons, #4 Exhibit 1 - Docket)(Esposito, Tonya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooke v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Tonya Esposito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Cooke
Represented By: Quinn Breece Lobato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?