The Standard Fire Insurance Company v. Carlos Heating, Refrigeration & A/C, Inc.
Plaintiff: The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Carlos Heating, Refrigeration & A/C, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv02803
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Carlos Reid on 11/03/2020, filed by The Standard Fire Insurance Company.(Matzye, Jennifer)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Standard Fire Insurance Company (Matzye, Jennifer)
September 29, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 14637124950 (jb5, Deputy Clerk)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Carlos Heating, Refrigeration & A/C, Inc. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carlos Heating, Refrigeration & A/C, Inc., filed by The Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter) (ols, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Standard Fire Insurance Company v. Carlos Heating, Refrigeration & A/C, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer L Matzye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Heating, Refrigeration & A/C, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?