Duran v. KSR Square LLC et al
Plaintiff: Naimi Duran
Defendant: KSR Square LLC a/k/a KSR Squared LLC, KSR Square LLC, KSR Squared LLC and Kevin T. Felder
Case Number: 8:2020cv03111
Filed: October 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Naimi Duran re #5 Order (Certificate of Compliance with December 3, 2020 Order) (Ray, James)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER ORDER addressing #3 Correspondence; granting an extension of 21 days for the Defendants to file an Answer. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/3/2020. (cm 12/3/2020 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/30/2020. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2020 Filing 3 Correspondence re: Communications from Defendant (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Ray, James)
October 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Kevin T. Felder, KSR Square LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KSR Square LLC a/k/a KSR Squared LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8931140.), filed by Naimi Duran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff Consent to FLSA Collective Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Felder, #4 Summons KSR Square LLC)(Ray, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duran v. KSR Square LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KSR Square LLC a/k/a KSR Squared LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KSR Square LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KSR Squared LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin T. Felder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naimi Duran
Represented By: James Martin Ray, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?