Laios et al v. MTM Builder/Developer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Edward T. Laios and Beachside Associates, LLC
Defendant: MTM Builder/Developer, Inc., Dean F. Morehouse and Morehouse Real Estate Investments, LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv03337
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Improper Venue filed by MTM Builder/Developer, Inc., Dean F. Morehouse, Morehouse Real Estate Investments, LLC.(Green, Walter)
January 7, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward T. Laios, Beachside Associates, LLC. Morehouse Real Estate Investments, LLC served on 11/20/2020, answer due 12/11/2020.(Ross, David)
January 7, 2021 Filing 16 QC NOTICE: #15 Affidavit of Service filed by Edward T. Laios, Beachside Associates, LLC was filed incorrectly. **Wrong event selected. Please re-file using the event summons returned executed, so the answer due date can be populated in the docket text. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
January 5, 2021 Filing 15 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and related documents served on Morehouse Real Estate Investment, LLC c/o AAA Corporate Services, Inc. on 11/20/20, filed by Beachside Associates, LLC, Edward T. Laios.(Ross, David) Modified on 1/7/2021 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
December 28, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Improper Venue filed by Beachside Associates, LLC, Edward T. Laios. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Taylor v. Shreeji Swami, Inc.), #2 Exhibit 2 (12/23/20 SDAT printout 1), #3 Exhibit 3 (12/23/20 bloomberg.com printout), #4 Exhibit 4 (12/23/20 manta.com printout), #5 Exhibit 5 (12/23/20 SDAT printout 2), #6 Exhibit 6 (Cooper declaration), #7 Text of Proposed Order denying Motion to Dismiss)(Ross, David)
December 14, 2020 Filing 13 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Morehouse Real Estate Investments, LLC (Green, Walter)
December 14, 2020 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by MTM Builder/Developer, Inc. (Green, Walter)
December 14, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Improper Venue by MTM Builder/Developer, Inc., Dean F. Morehouse, Morehouse Real Estate Investments, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, #2 Exhibit Operating Agreement, #3 Affidavit of Dean F. Morehouse, #4 Request for Hearing, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Walter)
November 30, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward T. Laios, Beachside Associates, LLC. MTM Builder/Developer, Inc. served on 11/24/2020, answer due 12/15/2020.(Ross, David)
November 30, 2020 Filing 9 QC NOTICE: #8 Affidavit of Service filed by Edward T. Laios, Beachside Associates, LLC was filed incorrectly. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. Wrong Event selected; please re-file using the event summons returned executed, so the answer due date can be populated in the docket text. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
November 27, 2020 Filing 8 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and related documents served on MTM Builder/Developer, Inc. on 11/19/20, filed by Beachside Associates, LLC, Edward T. Laios.(Ross, David) Modified on 11/30/2020 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
November 18, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued 21 days as to MTM Builder/Developer, Inc., Dean F. Morehouse and Morehouse Real Estate Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Beachside Associates, LLC, Edward T. Laios Summons to MTM (Ross, David)
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Beachside Associates, LLC, Edward T. Laios Summons to MREI (Ross, David)
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Beachside Associates, LLC, Edward T. Laios Summons to Morehouse (Ross, David)
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Beachside Associates, LLC, Edward T. Laios Civil Cover Sheet (Ross, David)
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Beachside Associates, LLC (Ross, David)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8968424.), filed by Edward T. Laios, Beachside Associates, LLC.(Ross, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laios et al v. MTM Builder/Developer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward T. Laios
Represented By: David G Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beachside Associates, LLC
Represented By: David G Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTM Builder/Developer, Inc.
Represented By: Walter W Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean F. Morehouse
Represented By: Walter W Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morehouse Real Estate Investments, LLC
Represented By: Walter W Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?