John and Jane Parents 1 et al v. Montgomery County Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: John Parent 2 and John and Jane Parents 1
Defendant: Judith Docca, Patricia B. O'Neill, Jeanette E. Dixon, Jack R. Smith, Rebecca Smondrowski, Shebra L. Evans, Brenda Wolff, Karla Silvestre and Montgomery County Board of Education
Case Number: 8:2020cv03552
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Referring Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CONSENT ORDER re #30 Proposed Consent Order. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/21/2021. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE by Jeanette E. Dixon, Judith Docca, Shebra L. Evans, Montgomery County Board of Education, Patricia B. O'Neill, Karla Silvestre, Jack R. Smith, Rebecca Smondrowski, Brenda Wolff Re: Proposed Consent Order (Stewart, Alexandra)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PAPERLESS ORDER Memorializing 1/19/21 pre-motion telephone conference between the Court and the parties. The Plaintiffs stated they do not wish to file an amended complaint. The Defendants motion to dismiss is due on February 5, 2021; Plaintiffs reply is due no later than April 6, 2021 (they may file earlier); and Defendants reply is due within four weeks of the opposition being filed, no later than May 6, 2021. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the motion and opposition shall not exceed 35 pages and the reply 20 pages, exclusive of tables and exhibits, in compliance with Local Rule 105. To facilitate the Courts review, the parties are ordered to highlight the relevant portions of any exhibits attached to their briefs. Finally, the parties are ordered to submit by 1/22/21 a consent proposed order regarding amicius briefs. Amici briefs must be filed within seven days of the brief they wish to support and must comply with Standing Order 2018-07 (available at https://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/standing-orders). Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/19/2021. (jc6s, Chambers)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 LETTER ORDER scheduling a pre-motion telephone conference call on 1/19/2021 at 10:00 a.m.. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/13/2021. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Documents. Defendants shall have until January 22, 2021 to file state court documents in accordance with local rule 103.5. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 1/13/2021. (jc6s, Chambers)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to L.R. 103.5, by Alexandra Tucker Stewart on behalf of Jeanette E. Dixon, Judith Docca, Shebra L. Evans, Montgomery County Board of Education, Patricia B. O'Neill, Karla Silvestre, Jack R. Smith, Rebecca Smondrowski, Brenda Wolff (Attachments: #1 State Court File)(Stewart, Alexandra)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Correspondence re: Pre-Motion Letter (Wolfson, Paul)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File State Court Documents Pursuant to Local Rule 103.5 by Jeanette E. Dixon, Judith Docca, Shebra L. Evans, Montgomery County Board of Education, Patricia B. O'Neill, Karla Silvestre, Jack R. Smith, Rebecca Smondrowski, Brenda Wolff (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stewart, Alexandra)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Correspondence regarding #9 Removal Notification Letter (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #20 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Steven W Fitschen. Directing attorney Steven W Fitschen to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/23/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James A Davids. Directing attorney James A Davids to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/23/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Steven W. Fitschen (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9025067.) by John Parent 2, John and Jane Parents 1.(Claybrook, Frederick) Modified on 12/22/2020 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk).
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James A. Davids (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9026593.) by John Parent 2, John and Jane Parents 1(Claybrook, Frederick)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick W. Claybrook, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Claybrook, Frederick)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE re #8 Standing Order Concerning Removal /Statement Concerning Removal filed by Jeanette E. Dixon, Judith Docca, Shebra L. Evans, Montgomery County Board of Education, Patricia B. O'Neill, Karla Silvestre, Jack R. Smith, Rebecca Smondrowski, Brenda Wolff.(Stewart, Alexandra)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Complaint. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/11/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Complaint, by Jeanette E. Dixon, Judith Docca, Shebra L. Evans, Montgomery County Board of Education, Patricia B. O'Neill, Karla Silvestre, Jack R. Smith, Rebecca Smondrowski, Brenda Wolff (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stewart, Alexandra)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Letter Order Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/9/2020. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Simon B Kress. Directing attorney Simon B Kress to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/9/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Alan E Schoenfeld. Directing attorney Alan E Schoenfeld to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 12/9/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Bruce M Berman. Directing attorney Bruce M Berman to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/9/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Paul Reinherz Q Wolfson. Directing attorney Paul Reinherz Q Wolfson to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 12/9/2020. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Removal Notification Letter (c/m 12/9/2020 - dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/9/2020. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Jeanette E. Dixon, Judith Docca, Shebra L. Evans, Montgomery County Board of Education, Patricia B. O'Neill, Karla Silvestre, Jack R. Smith, Rebecca Smondrowski, Brenda Wolff, filed by John Parent 2, John and Jane Parents 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (7) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR MONTGOMERY COUNTY, MARYLAND. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. Judge Theodore D. Chuang no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Simon B. Kress (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8999948.) by Jeanette E. Dixon, Judith Docca, Shebra L. Evans, Montgomery County Board of Education, Patricia B. O'Neill, Karla Silvestre, Jack R. Smith, Rebecca Smondrowski, Brenda Wolff(Stewart, Alexandra)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alan E. Schoenfeld (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8999947.) by Jeanette E. Dixon, Judith Docca, Shebra L. Evans, Montgomery County Board of Education, Patricia B. O'Neill, Karla Silvestre, Jack R. Smith, Rebecca Smondrowski, Brenda Wolff(Stewart, Alexandra)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Bruce M. Berman (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8999945.) by Jeanette E. Dixon, Judith Docca, Shebra L. Evans, Montgomery County Board of Education, Patricia B. O'Neill, Karla Silvestre, Jack R. Smith, Rebecca Smondrowski, Brenda Wolff(Stewart, Alexandra)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paul R.Q. Wolfson (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8999943.) by Jeanette E. Dixon, Judith Docca, Shebra L. Evans, Montgomery County Board of Education, Patricia B. O'Neill, Karla Silvestre, Jack R. Smith, Rebecca Smondrowski, Brenda Wolff(Stewart, Alexandra)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Jeanette E. Dixon, Judith Docca, Shebra L. Evans, Montgomery County Board of Education, Patricia B. O'Neill, Karla Silvestre, Jack R. Smith, Rebecca Smondrowski, Brenda Wolff identifying Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent or Affiliate for Montgomery County Board of Education.(Stewart, Alexandra)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Montgomery County, case number 483809-V. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-8999890), filed by Jeanette E. Dixon, Jack R. Smith, Montgomery County Board of Education, Judith Docca, Karla Silvestre, Patricia B. O'Neill, Shebra L. Evans, Rebecca Smondrowski, Brenda Wolff. (Attachments: #1 State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Defendants' Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stewart, Alexandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John and Jane Parents 1 et al v. Montgomery County Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Docca
Represented By: Alexandra Tucker Stewart
Represented By: Bruce M Berman
Represented By: Simon B Kress
Represented By: Alan E Schoenfeld
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Q Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia B. O'Neill
Represented By: Alexandra Tucker Stewart
Represented By: Bruce M Berman
Represented By: Simon B Kress
Represented By: Alan E Schoenfeld
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Q Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanette E. Dixon
Represented By: Alexandra Tucker Stewart
Represented By: Bruce M Berman
Represented By: Simon B Kress
Represented By: Alan E Schoenfeld
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Q Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack R. Smith
Represented By: Alexandra Tucker Stewart
Represented By: Bruce M Berman
Represented By: Simon B Kress
Represented By: Alan E Schoenfeld
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Q Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Smondrowski
Represented By: Alexandra Tucker Stewart
Represented By: Bruce M Berman
Represented By: Simon B Kress
Represented By: Alan E Schoenfeld
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Q Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shebra L. Evans
Represented By: Alexandra Tucker Stewart
Represented By: Bruce M Berman
Represented By: Simon B Kress
Represented By: Alan E Schoenfeld
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Q Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Wolff
Represented By: Alexandra Tucker Stewart
Represented By: Bruce M Berman
Represented By: Simon B Kress
Represented By: Alan E Schoenfeld
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Q Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Silvestre
Represented By: Alexandra Tucker Stewart
Represented By: Bruce M Berman
Represented By: Simon B Kress
Represented By: Alan E Schoenfeld
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Q Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County Board of Education
Represented By: Alexandra Tucker Stewart
Represented By: Bruce M Berman
Represented By: Simon B Kress
Represented By: Alan E Schoenfeld
Represented By: Paul Reinherz Q Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Parent 2
Represented By: Steven Werner Fitschen
Represented By: Frederick W. Claybrook, Jr.
Represented By: James Alan Davids
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John and Jane Parents 1
Represented By: Steven Werner Fitschen
Represented By: Frederick W. Claybrook, Jr.
Represented By: James Alan Davids
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?