Blake v. Green
Plaintiff: Shaidon Blake
Defendant: Robert L. Green
Interested Party: Office of the Attorney General
Case Number: 8:2020cv03563
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2021 Filing 7 Correspondence regarding #6 Response to #3 Order by Shaidon Blake (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Envelope)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 7, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #3 Order to Show Cause filed by Office of the Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Kristina Donnelly wth Attachments, #2 Exhibit 2 Maryland Judiciary Case Search Blake, #3 Exhibit 3 KS Website, #4 Exhibit 4 Order on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #5 Exhibit 5 KS2020-04-14 Reponse to Court Order - Redacted)(Lane Weber, Stephanie)
December 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Dorianne Avery Meloy on behalf of Office of the Attorney General (Meloy, Dorianne)
December 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Judith Lane Weber on behalf of Office of the Attorney General (Lane Weber, Stephanie)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Counsel SHALL SHOW CAUSE within 28 days of the date of this Order why injunctive relief should not be granted in favor of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/10/2020. (c/m as directed 12/10/20 nus, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 12/9/2020. (c/m 12/10/2020 nus, Deputy Clerk)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Order to Show Cause for an Preliminary Injunction & a Temporary Restraining Order) against Robert L. Green, filed by Shaidon Blake. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blake v. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaidon Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of the Attorney General
Represented By: Dorianne Avery Meloy
Represented By: Stephanie Judith Lane Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?