Flores v. Elite Commercial Cleaning, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ms. Marta Velasquez Flores and Marta Velasquez Flores
Defendant: Ana Lucia Vieira, Elite Commercial Cleaning, LLC and Elite Commercial Cleaning, L.L.C
Case Number: 8:2020cv03600
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Referring Judge: Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Removal - Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Stipulation re: Return of exhibits to Counsel. (jcs, Deputy Clerk)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 JURY VERDICT. (jcs, Deputy Clerk)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 -SEALED- JURY VERDICT Signed. (jcs, Deputy Clerk)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Jury Notes. (Attachments: #1 Jury Note 1, #2 Jury Note 1 - Envelope, #3 Jury Note 2, #4 Jury Note 2 - Envelope)(jcs, Deputy Clerk)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Stipulation re: Certification of Exhibits Submitted to the Jury. (jcs, Deputy Clerk)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Plaintiff's Witness List by Marta Velasquez Flores. (jcs, Deputy Clerk)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Joint Exhibit List(jcs, Deputy Clerk)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Defendant's Exhibit List by Elite Commercial Cleaning, L.L.C, Ana Lucia Vieira. (jcs, Deputy Clerk)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Plaintiff's Exhibit List by Marta Velasquez Flores. (jcs, Deputy Clerk)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Marta Velasquez Flores against Elite Commercial Cleaning, L.L.C, Ana Lucia Vieira in the amount of $3278.52. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 11/3/2023. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Jury Trial Day 5 completed on 11/3/2023 VERDICT RECORDED before Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi.(Court Reporter: Paula Leeper) (jh2s, Deputy Clerk)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Jury Trial Day 4 held on 11/2/2023 before Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi.(Court Reporter: Paula Leeper) (jh2s, Deputy Clerk)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Jury Trial Day 3 held on 11/1/2023 before Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi.(Court Reporter: Paula Leeper) (jh2s, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Jury Trial Day 2 held on 10/31/2023 before Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi.(Court Reporter: Paula Leeper) (jh2s, Deputy Clerk)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Jury Selection held on 10/30/2023 before Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi.(Court Reporter: Paula Leeper) (jh2s, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Paperless ORDER granting #38 Motion in Limine as to Termination, in part. Neither Defendant, nor Defendant's counsel may mention, discuss or allude to the reason for termination, without first seeking and receiving leave of the court outside of the presence of the jury. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 10/10/2023. (Quereshi, Ajmel)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Pretrial Conference held on 10/10/2023 before Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi. (FTR - Gomez - 2A.) (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Paperless ORDER granting #37 Motion in Limine as to Judicial Notice for the reasons stated on the record during the Pre-Trial Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 10/10/2023. (Quereshi, Ajmel)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Paperless ORDER granting #36 Motion in Limine as to Immigration Status for the reasons stated on the record during the Pre-Trial Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 10/10/2023. (Quereshi, Ajmel)
October 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Proposed Pretrial Order submitted by Marta Velasquez Flores. (Kurzyna, Mariusz)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Proposed Pretrial Order submitted by Marta Velasquez Flores. (Kurzyna, Mariusz)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Paperless ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time to File Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 9/22/2023. (Quereshi, Ajmel)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Pretrial Order by Marta Velasquez Flores(Kurzyna, Mariusz)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Proposed VERDICT by Marta Velasquez Flores.. (Kurzyna, Mariusz)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Proposed Jury Instructions by Marta Velasquez Flores. (Kurzyna, Mariusz)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Proposed Voir Dire by Marta Velasquez Flores. (Kurzyna, Mariusz)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION in Limine as to Termination by Marta Velasquez Flores(Kurzyna, Mariusz)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION in Limine for Judicial Notice by Marta Velasquez Flores(Kurzyna, Mariusz)
September 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION in Limine as to Immigration Status by Marta Velasquez Flores(Kurzyna, Mariusz)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER scheduling trial for October 30, 2023 through November 2, 2023; scheduling the pre-trial conference for 10 a.m. EST on October 10, 2023, in-person; and approving the deadlines in ECF No. 34. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 5/23/2023. (Quereshi, Ajmel)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Correspondence re: proposed pretrial deadlines (Kurzyna, Mariusz)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Status Conference held on 5/23/2023 before Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi.(Tape #2A- FTR.) (jw2s, Chambers)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: Virtual Status/Scheduling Conference set for 5/23/2023 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi. Information to connect to the hearing will be provided to counsel via separate email. (babs, Chambers)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Haffner, Julian)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Kurzyna, Mariusz)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER directing the parties to submit Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s) re #28 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 2/8/2023. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi for All Further Proceedings. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 2/8/2023. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Paperless Correspondence re: Scheduling a status call for February 7, 2023 at 4:30PM. Please dial in on (877) 810-9415 access code 5860700 (jw2s, Chambers)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STATUS REPORT by Marta Velasquez Flores(Kurzyna, Mariusz)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and other extant deadlines; directing parties to submit a status report within 10 days. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 9/6/2022. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and other extant deadlines by Marta Velasquez Flores. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kurzyna, Mariusz)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS Correspondence re: Scheduling a conference call for Thursday April 28, 2022 at 5:30PM. Please dial in on (877) 810-9415 and use access code 5860700 when prompted. (jw2s, Chambers)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; granting #16 Motion to Compel; staying discovery for 60 days. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 3/3/2022. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Telephone Conference held on 3/3/2022 before Judge George Jarrod Hazel. (jw2s, Chambers)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS Correspondence re: Scheduling a Discovery Call for Thursday March 3, 2022 at 1:00PM. Please dial in on (877) 810-9415 Access code 5860700 (jw2s, Chambers)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE by Marta Velasquez Flores re #16 MOTION to Compel (Proposed Order) (Kurzyna, Mariusz)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 QC NOTICE: #16 Motion to Compel filed by Marta Velasquez Flores was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Order. Pursuant to Local Rule 105.1 all Motions must be accompanied with a memorandum in support and proposed order. To correct this problem, file proposed order using the event Notice (Other) and link to #16 . (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STATUS REPORT by Marta Velasquez Flores(Kurzyna, Mariusz)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Compel by Marta Velasquez Flores (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Kurzyna, Mariusz)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Marta Velasquez Flores.(Kurzyna, Mariusz)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Elite Commercial Cleaning, L.L.C, Ana Lucia Vieira(Haffner, Julian)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 7/15/2021.. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 3/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Dispute Memo)(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Telephone Conference held on 3/30/2021 before Judge George Jarrod Hazel. (jw2s, Chambers)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Paperless Correspondence rescheduling the rule 16 conference call to Tuesday March 30th at 4:00PM. Please dial in on (877) 810-9415 access code 5860700 (jw2s, Chambers)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS Correspondence re: Scheduling a rule 16 conference call for Friday March 26, 2021 at 4:30PM. Please dial in on (877) 810-9415 access code 5860700 (jw2s, Chambers)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Paperless Correspondence re: Scheduling a Rule 16 conference for Tuesday March 2, 2021 at 4:30PM. Please Dial in on (877) 810-9415 Access code 5860700 (jw2s, Chambers)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Defendants' ANSWER to #6 Complaint by Elite Commercial Cleaning, L.L.C, Ana Lucia Vieira.(Haffner, Julian)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 12/15/2020. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 State Court COMPLAINT against Elite Commercial Cleaning, L.L.C, Ana Lucia Vieira, filed by Marta Velasquez Flores.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (6) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR MONTGOMERY COUNTY. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE by Elite Commercial Cleaning, L.L.C, Ana Lucia Vieira (Haffner, Julian)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Supplemental to Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Scheduling Order, #2 Summons Summons)(Haffner, Julian)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Elite Commercial Cleaning, L.L.C, Ana Lucia Vieira was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Civil Cover Sheet. To correct this problem, file Civil Cover Sheet using the event Notice (Other) and link Civil Cover Sheet to #1 . (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Ana Lucia Vieira, Elite Commercial Cleaning, LLC was filed incorrectly. **State court documents must be separated and labeled. Each state court document (i.e., complaint, summons, etc.) must be properly labeled and filed as separate attachments. Please refile each attachment using the "Other Documents" category, select the "Supplemental" event, and link filing to 1 Notice of Removal. The first labeled attachment can be the main document and the other labeled documents as separate attachments. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Montgomery County, Maryland, case number 483940-V. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9009973), filed by Elite Commercial Cleaning, LLC, Ana Lucia Vieira. (Attachments: #1 Summons + Complaint)(Haffner, Julian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores v. Elite Commercial Cleaning, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Lucia Vieira
Represented By: Julian Haffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Commercial Cleaning, LLC
Represented By: Julian Haffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elite Commercial Cleaning, L.L.C
Represented By: Julian Haffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Marta Velasquez Flores
Represented By: Mariusz Kurzyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marta Velasquez Flores
Represented By: Mariusz Kurzyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?