Graham v. Honeywell International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Darryl Graham
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2021cv00310
Filed: February 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Darryl Graham. Honeywell International, Inc. waiver sent on 2/25/2021, answer due 4/26/2021.(Wolfson, Reuben)
February 25, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Michael E. Ferrans, Esq.; Honeywell International, Inc. on 2/25/2021 by Darryl Graham. Waiver of Service due by 3/29/2021.(Wolfson, Reuben)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 2/16/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Honeywell International, Inc..(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
February 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Darryl Graham re #1 Complaint Summons (Wolfson, Reuben)
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Darryl Graham was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 . (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
February 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Honeywell International, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9098675.), filed by Darryl Graham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wolfson, Reuben)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graham v. Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Graham
Represented By: Reuben Wolfson
Represented By: Joyce E Smithey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?