Doe 1 et al v. Montgomery County Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: John Doe 3, John Doe 1, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 3M, Jane Doe 3, John Doe 2M, Jane Doe 2, John Doe 1M, John Doe 4 and Jane Doe 4
Defendant: Joseph Doody, Casey B Crouse, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Vincent Colbert, Eric Wallich, Montgomery County Board of Education and David Felsen
Case Number: 8:2021cv00356
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Referring Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM ORDER to Counsel of Record Granting #31 Motion to Seal Case, ECF No. 30 shall remain SEALED; Granting Motion to Seal First Amended Complaint; Granting Motion to Seal First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 4/1/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting #44 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Partial Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/30/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
March 26, 2021 Filing 44 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #38 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1, John Doe 1M, Jane Doe 2, John Doe 2M, Jane Doe 3, John Doe 3, John Doe 3M, Jane Doe 4, John Doe 4 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cardona, Edward)
March 24, 2021 Filing 43 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Attachments 42-1, 42-4, 42-7 to Joint Status Report ECF 42 by Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich re #42 Status Report,, (Attachments: #1 Attachment 42-1, #2 Attachment 42-4, #3 Attachment 42-7)(Allen, Jacquelyn)
March 24, 2021 Filing 42 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report re Court Order ECF 33 by Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich (Attachments: #1 Attachment Pl Motion to Unseal Juvenile Records, #2 Attachment Motion to Seal, #3 Attachment Defs Opp to Motion to Unseal, #4 Attachment WS Opp to Motion to Unseal, #5 Attachment WS Motion to Seal, #6 Attachment CT Motion to Quash, #7 Attachment Pl Opp to CT Motion, #8 Attachment Defs Opp to CT Motion, #9 Attachment Motion to Seal Am Compl, #10 Attachment Motion to Seal Am Compl)(Allen, Jacquelyn)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #39 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/23/2021. (jmhs, Chambers)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #37 Defendants Motion to Exceed Page Limitations. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/23/2021. (jmhs, Chambers)
March 19, 2021 Filing 39 Consent MOTION to Seal Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum ECF 38, 38-1 by Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich(Allen, Jacquelyn)
March 19, 2021 Filing 38 -SEALED- MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Allen, Jacquelyn)
March 19, 2021 Filing 37 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss ECF 38 by Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich(Allen, Jacquelyn)
March 19, 2021 Filing 36 -SEALED- MOTION to Dismiss County IV of the First Amended Complaints by Joseph Doody (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Karpinski, Kevin)
March 19, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION to Seal Defendant Doody's Motion to Dismiss Count IV of the First Amended Complaints by Joseph Doody(Karpinski, Kevin)
March 10, 2021 Filing 34 -SEALED- AMENDED COMPLAINT against Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Joseph Doody, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich, filed by John Doe 4, Jane Doe 4. (Attachments: #1 Redlined Amended Complaint)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting #5 and #13 Motions to Seal; granting #12 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/10/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
March 1, 2021 Filing 32 SEALED- Supplemental to #19 Local Rule, filed by Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich Supplemental Local Rule 1-3.5(a) Complaiance and Attachments filed under seal (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court Certified Docket Entries 226-240)(Allen, Jacquelyn) Modified on 3/1/2021 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
February 26, 2021 Filing 31 -SEALED- MOTION to Seal Case by David Felsen (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Felsen, David)
February 26, 2021 Filing 30 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Seal State Court Record filed by David Felsen.(Felsen, David)
February 25, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE by Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Joseph Doody, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Unseal Juvenile Record(ECF 1-235) (Allen, Jacquelyn)
February 23, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by William Hughes Murphy, Jr on behalf of Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1, John Doe 1M, Jane Doe 2, John Doe 2M (Murphy, William)
February 23, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Malcolm Peter Ruff on behalf of Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1, John Doe 1M, Jane Doe 2, John Doe 2M (Ruff, Malcolm)
February 23, 2021 Filing 26 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1, John Doe 1M, Jane Doe 2, John Doe 2M (Cardona, Edward)
February 23, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Louis Cardona, III on behalf of Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1, John Doe 1M, Jane Doe 2, John Doe 2M (Cardona, Edward)
February 23, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE re #17 Standing Order Concerning Removal, filed by Joseph Doody.(Karpinski, Kevin)
February 23, 2021 Filing 23 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Joseph Doody identifying Corporate Parent Brit Global Specialty USA for Joseph Doody.(Karpinski, Kevin)
February 19, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE by Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich re #17 Standing Order Concerning Removal, Defendants' Statement Pursuant to Standing Order Regarding Removal (Allen, Jacquelyn)
February 19, 2021 Filing 21 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich (Allen, Jacquelyn)
February 19, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Seal State Court Record by Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Joseph Doody, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich(Allen, Jacquelyn)
February 19, 2021 Filing 19 -SEALED- Local Rule 103.5(a) Compliance (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court Certification & Jacket 1, #2 Attachment State Court Jacket 2, #3 Attachment State Court Jacket 3, #4 Attachment State Court Jacket 4, #5 Attachment State Court Jacket 5, #6 Attachment State Court Jacket 6, #7 Attachment State Court Jacket 7, #8 Attachment State Court Jacket 8)(Allen, Jacquelyn)
February 19, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Maurice DeGonia, II on behalf of Jane Doe 3, John Doe 3, John Doe 3M (DeGonia, Thomas)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Standing Order Concerning Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Casey B Crouse, Montgomery County Board of Education, Eric Wallich, Vincent Colbert, Joseph Doody, Jeffrey K Sullivan. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 2/18/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 17, 2021 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (15-16) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR MONTGOMERY COUNTY. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 17, 2021 Filing 16 -SEALED- STATE COURT AMENDED COMPLAINT against Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Joseph Doody, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich, filed by John Doe 3M, John Doe 3, John Doe 1M, John Doe 2M, John Doe 1, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 1. (Attachments: #1 Redlined Amended Complaint)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 17, 2021 Filing 15 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Joseph Doody, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich, filed by John Doe 3M, John Doe 3, John Doe 1M, John Doe 2M, John Doe 1, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 1. (Please refer to ECF No. 1 for exhibits related to the State Court Complaint)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #11 Defendants Board of Education, Sullivan, Crouse, Doody, Wallich and Colbert's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaints and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (until 3/19/2021). Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 2/17/2021. (jmhs, Chambers)
February 17, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Peter J. Messitte. Judge Paula Xinis no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Seal ECF 12 Motion to Consolidate by Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Joseph Doody, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich(Allen, Jacquelyn)
February 16, 2021 Filing 12 -SEALED- MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Joseph Doody, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich(Allen, Jacquelyn)
February 16, 2021 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Motion to Amended Complaint by Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Joseph Doody, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich(Allen, Jacquelyn)
February 16, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Bock Karpinski on behalf of Joseph Doody (Karpinski, Kevin)
February 12, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Eva Turlington on behalf of Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich (Turlington, Margaret)
February 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Charles O Hara on behalf of Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich (O Hara, Sean)
February 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Lisehora Kane on behalf of Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich (Kane, Patricia)
February 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacquelyn Allen on behalf of Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Joseph Doody, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich (Allen, Jacquelyn)
February 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents Contained in State Court Record by Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Joseph Doody, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich(Allen, Jacquelyn)
February 12, 2021 Filing 4 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Sealed Documents at 1-171, 1-172, 1-185, 1-186, 1-201, 1-210, 1-213 and 1-235 by Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Joseph Doody, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, (Attachments: #1 Attachment ECF 1-171, #2 Attachment ECF 1-172, #3 Attachment ECF 1-185, #4 Attachment ECF 1-186, #5 Attachment ECF 1-201, #6 Attachment ECF 1-210, #7 Attachment ECF 1-213, #8 Attachment ECF 1-235)(Allen, Jacquelyn)
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 UNREDACTED DOCUMENT (Attachments: #1 Attachment ECF 1-125 Unredacted, #2 Attachment ECF 1-126 Unredacted, #3 Attachment ECF 1-129 Unredacted, #4 Attachment ECF 1-135 Unredacted, #5 Attachment ECF 1-218 Unredacted, #6 Attachment ECF 1-219 Unredacted, #7 Attachment ECF 1-240 Unredacted)(Allen, Jacquelyn)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Joseph Doody, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment)(Allen, Jacquelyn)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Montgomery County, Maryland, case number 478907V. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9108922), filed by Casey B Crouse, Joseph Doody, Vincent Colbert, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Montgomery County Board of Education, Eric Wallich. (Attachments: #1 Attachment DE 1, #2 Attachment DE 2, #3 Attachment DE 3, #4 Attachment DE 4, #5 Attachment DE 5, #6 Attachment DE 6, #7 Attachment DE 7, #8 Attachment DE 8, #9 Attachment DE 9, #10 Attachment DE 10, #11 Attachment DE 11, #12 Attachment DE 12, #13 Attachment DE 13, #14 Attachment DE 14, #15 Attachment DE 15, #16 Attachment DE 16, #17 Attachment DE 17, #18 Attachment DE 18, #19 Attachment DE 19, #20 Attachment DE 20, #21 Attachment DE 21, #22 Attachment DE 22, #23 Attachment DE 23, #24 Attachment DE 24, #25 Attachment DE 25, #26 Attachment DE 26, #27 Attachment DE 27, #28 Attachment DE 28, #29 Attachment DE 29, #30 Attachment DE 30, #31 Attachment DE 31, #32 Attachment DE 32, #33 Attachment DE 33, #34 Attachment DE 34, #35 Attachment DE 35, #36 Attachment DE 36, #37 Attachment DE 37, #38 Attachment DE 38, #39 Attachment DE 39, #40 Attachment DE 40, #41 Attachment DE 41, #42 Attachment DE 42, #43 Attachment DE 43, #44 Attachment DE 44, #45 Attachment DE 45, #46 Attachment DE 46, #47 Attachment DE 47, #48 Attachment DE 48, #49 Attachment DE 49, #50 Attachment DE 50, #51 Attachment DE 51, #52 Attachment DE 52, #53 Attachment DE 53, #54 Attachment DE 54, #55 Attachment DE 55, #56 Attachment DE 56, #57 Attachment DE 57, #58 Attachment DE 58, #59 Attachment DE 59, #60 Attachment DE 60, #61 Attachment DE 61, #62 Attachment DE 62, #63 Attachment DE 63, #64 Attachment DE 64, #65 Attachment DE 65, #66 Attachment DE 66, #67 Attachment DE 67, #68 Attachment DE 68, #69 Attachment DE 69, #70 Attachment DE 70, #71 Attachment DE 71, #72 Attachment DE 72, #73 Attachment DE 73, #74 Attachment DE 74, #75 Attachment DE 75, #76 Attachment DE 76, #77 Attachment DE 77, #78 Attachment DE 78, #79 Attachment DE 79, #80 Attachment DE 80, #81 Attachment DE 81, #82 Attachment DE 82, #83 Attachment DE 83, #84 Attachment DE 84, #85 Attachment DE 85, #86 Attachment DE 86, #87 Attachment DE 87, #88 Attachment DE 88, #89 Attachment DE 89, #90 Attachment DE 90, #91 Attachment DE 91, #92 Attachment DE 92, #93 Attachment DE 93, #94 Attachment DE 94, #95 Attachment DE 95, #96 Attachment DE 96, #97 Attachment DE 97, #98 Attachment DE 98, #99 Attachment DE 99, #100 Attachment DE 100, #101 Attachment DE 101, #102 Attachment DE 102, #103 Attachment DE 103, #104 Attachment DE 104, #105 Attachment DE 105, #106 Attachment DE 106, #107 Attachment DE 107, #108 Attachment DE 108, #109 Attachment DE 109, #110 Attachment DE 110, #111 Attachment DE 111, #112 Attachment DE 112, #113 Attachment DE 113, #114 Attachment DE 114, #115 Attachment DE 115, #116 Attachment DE 116, #117 Attachment DE 117, #118 Attachment DE 118, #119 Attachment DE 119, #120 Attachment DE 120, #121 Attachment DE 121, #122 Attachment DE 122, #123 Attachment DE 123, #124 Attachment DE 124, #125 Attachment DE 125 Redacted, #126 Attachment DE 126 Redacted, #127 Attachment DE 127, #128 Attachment DE 128, #129 Attachment DE 129 Redacted, #130 Attachment DE 130, #131 Attachment DE 131, #132 Attachment DE 132, #133 Attachment DE 133, #134 Attachment DE 134, #135 Attachment DE 135 Redacted, #136 Attachment DE 136, #137 Attachment DE 137, #138 Attachment DE 138, #139 Attachment DE 139, #140 Attachment DE 140, #141 Attachment DE 141, #142 Attachment DE 142, #143 Attachment DE 143, #144 Attachment DE 144, #145 Attachment DE 145, #146 Attachment DE 146, #147 Attachment DE 147, #148 Attachment DE 148, #149 Attachment DE 149, #150 Attachment DE 150, #151 Attachment DE 151, #152 Attachment DE 152, #153 Attachment DE 153, #154 Attachment DE 154, #155 Attachment DE 155, #156 Attachment DE 156, #157 Attachment DE 157, #158 Attachment DE 158, #159 Attachment DE 159, #160 Attachment DE 160, #161 Attachment DE 161, #162 Attachment DE 162, #163 Attachment DE 163, #164 Attachment DE 164, #165 Attachment DE 165, #166 Attachment DE 166, #167 Attachment DE 167, #168 Attachment DE 168, #169 Attachment DE 169, #170 Attachment DE 170, #171 Attachment DE 171 Sealed, #172 Attachment DE 172 Sealed, #173 Attachment DE 173, #174 Attachment DE 174, #175 Attachment DE 175, #176 Attachment DE 176, #177 Attachment DE 177, #178 Attachment DE 178, #179 Attachment DE 179, #180 Attachment DE 180, #181 Attachment DE 181, #182 Attachment DE 182, #183 Attachment DE 183, #184 Attachment DE 184, #185 Attachment DE 185 Sealed, #186 Attachment DE 186 Sealed, #187 Attachment DE 187, #188 Attachment DE 188, #189 Attachment DE 189, #190 Attachment DE 190, #191 Attachment DE 191, #192 Attachment DE 192, #193 Attachment DE 193, #194 Attachment DE 194, #195 Attachment DE 195, #196 Attachment DE 196, #197 Attachment DE 197, #198 Attachment DE 198, #199 Attachment DE 199, #200 Attachment DE 200, #201 Attachment DE 201 Sealed, #202 Attachment DE 202, #203 Attachment DE 203, #204 Attachment DE 204, #205 Attachment DE 205, #206 Attachment DE 206, #207 Attachment DE 207, #208 Attachment DE 208, #209 Attachment DE 209, #210 Attachment DE 210 Sealed, #211 Attachment DE 211, #212 Attachment DE 212, #213 Attachment DE 213 (Sealed), #214 Attachment DE 214, #215 Attachment DE 215, #216 Attachment DE 216, #217 Attachment DE 217, #218 Attachment DE 218 Redacted, #219 Attachment DE 219 Redacted, #220 Attachment DE 220, #221 Attachment DE 221, #222 Attachment DE 222, #223 Attachment DE 223, #224 Attachment DE 224, #225 Attachment DE 225, #226 Attachment DE 226, #227 Attachment DE 227, #228 Attachment DE 228, #229 Attachment DE 229, #230 Attachment DE 230, #231 Attachment DE 231, #232 Attachment DE 232, #233 Attachment DE 233, #234 Attachment DE 234, #235 Attachment DE 235 Sealed, #236 Attachment DE 236, #237 Attachment DE 237, #238 Attachment DE 238, #239 Attachment DE 239, #240 Attachment Docket Entries -Redacted)(Allen, Jacquelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe 1 et al v. Montgomery County Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Doody
Represented By: Kevin Bock Karpinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey B Crouse
Represented By: Margaret Eva Turlington
Represented By: Sean Charles O Hara
Represented By: Jacquelyn Allen
Represented By: Patricia Lisehora Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey K Sullivan
Represented By: Margaret Eva Turlington
Represented By: Sean Charles O Hara
Represented By: Jacquelyn Allen
Represented By: Patricia Lisehora Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Colbert
Represented By: Margaret Eva Turlington
Represented By: Sean Charles O Hara
Represented By: Jacquelyn Allen
Represented By: Patricia Lisehora Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Wallich
Represented By: Margaret Eva Turlington
Represented By: Sean Charles O Hara
Represented By: Jacquelyn Allen
Represented By: Patricia Lisehora Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County Board of Education
Represented By: Margaret Eva Turlington
Represented By: Sean Charles O Hara
Represented By: Jacquelyn Allen
Represented By: Patricia Lisehora Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Felsen
Represented By: David Keith Felsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 3
Represented By: Jerry Williams Hyatt
Represented By: Thomas Maurice DeGonia, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 1
Represented By: Malcolm Peter Ruff
Represented By: Edward Louis Cardona, III
Represented By: William Hughes Murphy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 1
Represented By: Malcolm Peter Ruff
Represented By: Edward Louis Cardona, III
Represented By: William Hughes Murphy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 3M
Represented By: Jerry Williams Hyatt
Represented By: Thomas Maurice DeGonia, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 3
Represented By: Jerry Williams Hyatt
Represented By: Thomas Maurice DeGonia, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 2M
Represented By: Malcolm Peter Ruff
Represented By: Edward Louis Cardona, III
Represented By: William Hughes Murphy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 2
Represented By: Malcolm Peter Ruff
Represented By: Edward Louis Cardona, III
Represented By: William Hughes Murphy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 1M
Represented By: Malcolm Peter Ruff
Represented By: Edward Louis Cardona, III
Represented By: William Hughes Murphy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 4
Represented By: Alyse Lauren Prawde
Represented By: Matthew M Bryant
Represented By: Timothy Francis Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 4
Represented By: Alyse Lauren Prawde
Represented By: Matthew M Bryant
Represented By: Timothy Francis Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?