Doe 4 et al v. Montgomery County Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: John Doe 4, John Doe 4M and Jane Doe 4
Defendant: Joseph Doody, Casey B Crouse, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Vincent Colbert, Eric Wallich, Montgomery County Board of Education and David Felsen
Case Number: 8:2021cv00360
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Peter J Messitte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting #6 #15 Motions to Seal; Granting #14 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 3/10/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
March 10, 2021 Cases associated: Create association to 8:21-cv-00356-PJM. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
March 10, 2021 THIS IS A CONSOLIDATED CASE. PLEASE DO NOT ELECTRONICALLY FILE OR SPREAD TEXT IN THIS CASE. ALL SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS ARE TO BE ELECTRONICALLY FILED ONLY IN THE LEAD CASE (8:21-cv-00356-PJM). (heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2021 Filing 25 -SEALED- MOTION to Seal by David Felsen (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Felsen, David)
February 26, 2021 Filing 24 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents Contained in State Court Record filed by David Felsen.(Felsen, David)
February 23, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE re #17 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Joseph Doody.(Karpinski, Kevin)
February 23, 2021 Filing 22 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Joseph Doody identifying Other Affiliate Brit Global Specialty USA for Joseph Doody.(Karpinski, Kevin)
February 22, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE re #14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Jane Doe 4, John Doe 4.(Bryant, Matthew)
February 19, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE by Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich re #17 Standing Order Concerning Removal Defendants' Statement Pursuant to Standing Order Regarding Removal (Allen, Jacquelyn)
February 19, 2021 Filing 19 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich (Allen, Jacquelyn)
February 19, 2021 Filing 18 Local Rule 103.5(a) Compliance (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certification & State Court Record)(Allen, Jacquelyn)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 2/17/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
February 17, 2021 Filing 16 -SEALED- AMENDED COMPLAINT against Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Joseph Doody, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich, filed by John Doe 4, Jane Doe 4. (Attachments: #1 Redline Version)(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
February 17, 2021 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (16) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR MONTGOMERY COUNTY. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Seal ECF 14 Motion to Consolidate by Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Joseph Doody, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich(Allen, Jacquelyn)
February 16, 2021 Filing 14 -SEALED- MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Joseph Doody, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich(Allen, Jacquelyn)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #12 Defendants Board of Education, Sullivan, Crouse, Doody, Wallich and Colbert's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaints and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (until 3/19/2021). Signed by Judge Peter J. Messitte on 2/16/2021. (jmhs, Chambers)
February 16, 2021 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Motion to Amended Complaint by Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Joseph Doody, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich(Allen, Jacquelyn)
February 16, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Bock Karpinski on behalf of Joseph Doody (Karpinski, Kevin)
February 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Eva Turlington on behalf of Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich (Turlington, Margaret)
February 12, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Charles O Hara on behalf of Casey B Crouse, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich (O Hara, Sean)
February 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Lisehora Kane on behalf of Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich (Kane, Patricia)
February 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacquelyn Allen on behalf of Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich (Allen, Jacquelyn)
February 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Seal Certain Documents Contained in State Court Record by Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Joseph Doody, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material)(Allen, Jacquelyn)
February 12, 2021 Filing 5 -SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Joseph Doody, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Plts' First Amended Complaint (SEALED))(Allen, Jacquelyn)
February 12, 2021 Filing 4 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal,,,, filed by Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Joseph Doody, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich (Attachments: #1 Attachment Complaint & Jury Demand, #2 Attachment Plaintiff's Information Sheet, #3 Attachment Line of Appearance for Plts' Counsel, #4 Attachment Instructions for Service, #5 Attachment Notice of Scheduling Hearing, #6 Attachment Notice of New Case Number, #7 Attachment Summons - BOE, #8 Attachment Plts' Motion for Production of Records held by MCPS & SAO & Request for Hearing, #9 Attachment Plts' Motion for Production of Records Held by MCPS & SAO & Request for Hearing, #10 Attachment Consent Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, #11 Attachment Partial Answer Crouse, Wallich, Cobert & MC BOE, #12 Attachment Partial Motion to Dismiss & Memo-Crouse, Doody, Wallich & Colbert, #13 Attachment Partial Motion to Dismiss & Memo-MC BOE, #14 Attachment Doody Answer Presenting Defenses, #15 Attachment Notice of Existing Schedule to Kevin Karpinski, #16 Attachment Notice of Pending Events, #17 Attachment Defs BOE, Crouse, Coblert & Wallich Scheduling Hrg Statement, #18 Attachment Defs' Mot to Consolidate, #19 Attachment Plts' Opp to MC BOE Motion to Dismiss, #20 Attachment Plts' Opp to Individual Defs' Motion to Dismiss, #21 Attachment Plts' Scheduling Hearing Statement, #22 Attachment Order Granting Motion to Consolidate 478907V LEAD CASE, #23 Attachment Ordered that Ind Defs' Partial Motion to Dismiss is MOOT, #24 Attachment Ordered that MC BOE Partial MTD is MOOT, #25 Attachment Plts' First Amended Complaint (SEALED), #26 Attachment Circuit Court Docket Entries)(Allen, Jacquelyn)
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 Supplemental to #1 Notice of Removal,,,, filed by Vincent Colbert, Casey B Crouse, Joseph Doody, Montgomery County Board of Education, Jeffrey K Sullivan, Eric Wallich (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet Attachment)(Allen, Jacquelyn)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal,,,, filed by Casey B Crouse, Montgomery County Board of Education, Eric Wallich, Vincent Colbert, Joseph Doody, Jeffrey K Sullivan was filed incorrectly. **Each state court document (i.e., complaint, summons, etc.) must be properly labeled and filed as separate attachments. Please refile each attachment using the "Other Documents" category, select the "Supplemental" event, and link filing to 1 Notice of Removal. The first labeled attachment can be the main document and the other labeled documents as separate attachments. File any pending motions as separate docket entries. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Montgomery County, Maryland, case number 478941V. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9109859), filed by Jeffrey K Sullivan, Joseph Doody, Eric Wallich, Casey B Crouse, Vincent Colbert, Montgomery County Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Attachment DE 1, #2 Attachment DE 2, #3 Attachment DE 3, #4 Attachment DE 4, #5 Attachment DE 5, #6 Attachment DE 6, #7 Attachment DE 7, #8 Attachment DE 8, #9 Attachment DE 9, #10 Attachment DE 10, #11 Attachment DE 11, #12 Attachment DE 12, #13 Attachment DE 13, #14 Attachment DE 14, #15 Attachment DE 15, #16 Attachment DE 16, #17 Attachment DE 17, #18 Attachment DE 18, #19 Attachment DE 19, #20 Attachment DE 20, #21 Attachment DE 21, #22 Attachment DE 22, #23 Attachment DE 23, #24 Attachment DE 24, #25 Attachment DE 25, #26 Attachment First Amended Complaint (SEALED), #27 Attachment Circuit Court Docket Entries)(Allen, Jacquelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe 4 et al v. Montgomery County Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Doody
Represented By: Kevin Bock Karpinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey B Crouse
Represented By: Margaret Eva Turlington
Represented By: Sean Charles O Hara
Represented By: Jacquelyn Allen
Represented By: Patricia Lisehora Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey K Sullivan
Represented By: Margaret Eva Turlington
Represented By: Sean Charles O Hara
Represented By: Jacquelyn Allen
Represented By: Patricia Lisehora Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Colbert
Represented By: Margaret Eva Turlington
Represented By: Sean Charles O Hara
Represented By: Jacquelyn Allen
Represented By: Patricia Lisehora Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Wallich
Represented By: Margaret Eva Turlington
Represented By: Sean Charles O Hara
Represented By: Jacquelyn Allen
Represented By: Patricia Lisehora Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery County Board of Education
Represented By: Margaret Eva Turlington
Represented By: Sean Charles O Hara
Represented By: Jacquelyn Allen
Represented By: Patricia Lisehora Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Felsen
Represented By: David Keith Felsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 4
Represented By: Alyse Lauren Prawde
Represented By: Matthew M Bryant
Represented By: Timothy Francis Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 4M
Represented By: Alyse Lauren Prawde
Represented By: Matthew M Bryant
Represented By: Timothy Francis Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 4
Represented By: Alyse Lauren Prawde
Represented By: Matthew M Bryant
Represented By: Timothy Francis Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?