Evans v. Centennial Holding Company, LLC et al
Petitioner: Olivia Evans
Respondent: First Communities Management, Inc., Centennial Holding Company, LLC and Deborah Murphy
Case Number: 8:2021cv00500
Filed: February 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/8/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Olivia Evans by Olivia Evans. (Baker, Kellee)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE within 14 days. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/25/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/11/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Centennial Holding Company, LLC, First Communities Management, Inc., Deborah Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition against CENTENNIAL HOLDING COMPANY, LLC, FIRST COMMUNITIES MANAGEMENT, INC., Deborah Murphy ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9129938.), filed by Olivia Evans. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2, #7 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3)(Baker, Kellee)
February 25, 2021 Case Assigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. (ko, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Centennial Holding Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: First Communities Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Centennial Holding Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Deborah Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Olivia Evans
Represented By: Kellee Genean Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?