Bailey et al v. Thompson Creek Window Company et al
Plaintiff: William Estrada and Lawrence Bailey
Defendant: Rick Wuest and Thompson Creek Window Company
Case Number: 8:2021cv00844
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Thompson Creek Window Company, Rick Wuest (Bourgeois, John)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss (or Stay) and Compel Arbitration by Thompson Creek Window Company, Rick Wuest (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Bourgeois, John)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' Answer or otherwise response to the Complaint is extended to May 21, 2021. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 4/29/2021. (tb2s, Chambers)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Diane J Zelmer. Directing attorney Diane J Zelmer to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 4/28/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Diane J. Zelmer (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9246287.) by Thompson Creek Window Company, Rick Wuest(Strickland, Bradley)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Mills Strickland on behalf of Thompson Creek Window Company, Rick Wuest (Strickland, Bradley)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Thompson Creek Window Company, Rick Wuest (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bourgeois, John)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint/Summons served on Rick Wuest on 04/14/2021, filed by Lawrence Bailey, William Estrada.(Protil, Karl)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint/Summons served on RA - Ernest F. Wuest, III on 04/09/2021, filed by Lawrence Bailey, William Estrada.(Protil, Karl)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Patricia N Syverson. Directing attorney Patricia N Syverson to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 4/7/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Elaine A Ryan. Directing attorney Elaine A Ryan to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 4/7/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Carrie A Laliberte. Directing attorney Carrie A Laliberte to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 4/7/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Timothy P Bosson. Attorney Timothy P Bosson will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 4/7/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher Le. Directing attorney Christopher Le to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 4/7/2021. (mh4, Deputy Clerk)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Patricia N. Syverson (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9206002.) by Lawrence Bailey, William Estrada(Protil, Karl)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Elaine A. Ryan (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9205999.) by Lawrence Bailey, William Estrada(Protil, Karl)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Carrie A. Laliberte (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9205996.) by Lawrence Bailey, William Estrada(Protil, Karl)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tim Bosson (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9205986.) by Lawrence Bailey, William Estrada(Protil, Karl)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher Le (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9205981.) by Lawrence Bailey, William Estrada(Protil, Karl)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Thompson Creek Window Company, Rick Wuest.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thompson Creek Window Company, Rick Wuest ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9198632.), filed by Lawrence Bailey, William Estrada. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons proposed Summons - Thompson Creek, #3 Summons proposed Summons - Rick Wuest)(Protil, Karl)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Paula Xinis. (ko, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey et al v. Thompson Creek Window Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Estrada
Represented By: Karl J Protil, Jr
Represented By: Carrie A Laliberte
Represented By: Elaine A Ryan
Represented By: Patricia N Syverson
Represented By: Christopher Le
Represented By: Timothy P Bosson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Bailey
Represented By: Karl J Protil, Jr
Represented By: Carrie A Laliberte
Represented By: Elaine A Ryan
Represented By: Patricia N Syverson
Represented By: Christopher Le
Represented By: Timothy P Bosson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Wuest
Represented By: Bradley Mills Strickland
Represented By: Diane J Zelmer
Represented By: John Augustine Bourgeois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson Creek Window Company
Represented By: Bradley Mills Strickland
Represented By: Diane J Zelmer
Represented By: John Augustine Bourgeois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?