Cammaroto et al v. Bank of America N.A.
Plaintiff: Robert J. Cammaroto and Sandra G. Cammaroto
Defendant: Bank of America N.A. and Bank of America, National Association
Case Number: 8:2021cv00895
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Directing Parties to Submit Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s) re #18 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 5/14/2021. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan for All Further Proceedings. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 5/14/2021. (kns, Deputy Clerk) Modified to include (c/m on 5/14/2021) (kns, Deputy Clerk).
May 14, 2021 Filing 17 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Duhig, Peter)
May 7, 2021 Filing 16 Rule 16 Case Management Conference held on 5/7/2021 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang. (FTR - Derro - 3A) (tds, Deputy Clerk)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER. As discussed at the May 7, 2021 Rule 16 Conference, the Joint Request for Modification to Scheduling Order, ECF No. 14, is GRANTED. The revised discovery deadlines are as stated in that filing. As also discussed, within 7 days, Bank of America shall file a status report as to whether it consents to have this case transferred to a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 5/7/2021. (nrs, Chambers)
May 6, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE by Bank of America, National Association Joint Request to Modify Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duhig, Peter)
April 27, 2021 Filing 13 PAPERLESS NOTICE. A RULE 16 CONFERENCE is scheduled for May 7, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. To join the call at the scheduled time: (1) Dial 1-888-557-8511. (2) Enter access code 3008173, followed by the # key. You will then be placed on hold until Chambers dials into the call, at which point you will be prompted to enter a security code. (3) When prompted, enter security code 05070930 followed by the # key. The call will be recorded, so please do not use speakerphones as they compromise sound quality. Also, we ask that parties not remain on the conference line after the Judge has left the call, to ensure that the line is free for other calls that may be on the Judge's calendar. The parties are reminded that they should be prepared to address whether they consent to have all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge and whether they wish to participate in a mediation session with a Magistrate Judge, whether before, during, or after discovery. Parties are expected to consult with their clients and confer with each other on these issues in advance of the Rule 16 Case Management Conference and, if possible, present joint views to the Court. (nrs, Chambers)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 9/9/2021. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/26/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/26/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
April 23, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by Bank of America, National Association re #1 Notice of Removal, (Duhig, Peter)
April 22, 2021 Filing 8 Local Rule 103(5)(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Duhig, Peter)
April 15, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Bank of America, National Association.(Duhig, Peter)
April 15, 2021 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, National Association identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company for Bank of America, National Association.(Duhig, Peter)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 4/9/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
April 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Bank of America, National Association, Robert J. Cammaroto, Sandra G. Cammaroto or counsel for Bank of America, National Association, Robert J. Cammaroto, Sandra G. Cammaroto are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 4/23/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing Order Concerning Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Bank of America, National Association. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 4/9/2021. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
April 9, 2021 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-2) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR CALVERT COUNTY. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
April 9, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Bank of America, National Association, filed by Robert J. Cammaroto, Sandra G. Cammaroto. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report, #2 Writ of Summons)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
April 9, 2021 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Calvert County, Maryland, case number C-04-CV-21-000046. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9210936), filed by Bank of America N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Duhig, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cammaroto et al v. Bank of America N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: Peter J Duhig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Represented By: Peter J Duhig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Cammaroto
Represented By: David C. Weigel
Represented By: Bryan T Dugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra G. Cammaroto
Represented By: David C. Weigel
Represented By: Bryan T Dugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?