United States of America v. Kachikwu et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Somachi Kachikwu and Dumebi Kachikwu
Case Number: 8:2021cv01546
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 6502
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Somachi Kachikwu served on 6/26/2021, answer due 7/19/2021.(Morton, Benton)
July 14, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Dumebi Kachikwu served on 6/26/2021, answer due 7/19/2021.(Morton, Benton)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 QC NOTICE: #3 Affidavit of Service filed by United States of America, #4 Affidavit of Service filed by United States of America was filed incorrectly. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. please refile using the event Summons Returned Executed so that the answer due date is automatically populated into the docket text. Thank you. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2021 Filing 4 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Somachi Kachikwu on June 26, 2021, filed by United States of America.(Morton, Benton) Modified on 7/7/2021 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
July 2, 2021 Filing 3 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Dumebi Kachikwu on June 26, 2021, filed by United States of America.(Morton, Benton) Modified on 7/7/2021 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
June 24, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. Judge George Levi Russell, III no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Dumebi Kachikwu, Somachi Kachikwu. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DUMEBI KACHIKWU, SOMACHI KACHIKWU, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Tobin, Olga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Kachikwu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Somachi Kachikwu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dumebi Kachikwu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Olga L Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?