Balkin v. UNUM Life Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Balkin
Defendant: UNUM Life Co. of America, Hogan Lovells US LLP LTD Plan, UNUM Life Insurance Company and Hogan Lovells, LLP Long Term Disability Plan
Case Number: 8:2021cv01623
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Nina Wasow. Directing attorney Nina Wasow to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/17/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nina Wasow (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9436198.) by Kelly Balkin(Clark, Denise)
August 13, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kelly Balkin. Hogan Lovells, LLP Long Term Disability Plan served on 8/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021; UNUM Life Insurance Company served on 7/23/2021, answer due 9/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Clark, Denise)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 7/1/2021. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Kelly Balkin or counsel for Kelly Balkin are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 7/15/2021. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 1, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hogan Lovells US LLP LTD Plan, UNUM Life Co. of America ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9355060.), filed by Kelly Balkin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Clark, Denise)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balkin v. UNUM Life Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Balkin
Represented By: Denise M Clark
Represented By: Nina Wasow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Co. of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hogan Lovells US LLP LTD Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hogan Lovells, LLP Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?