Dunn v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Andrew Martin Dunn
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA Notify
Case Number: 8:2021cv02104
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: J Mark Coulson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 9/28/2021. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ols, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 8/23/2021. (daws, Chambers)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. Pursuant to Standing Order 2021-06, which can be downloaded #here, Andrew Martin Dunn or counsel for Andrew Martin Dunn has 30 days from the date of this notice to file their consent or declination to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent or declination, go to Civil > Correspondence > Magistrate Judge - consent/decline. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/17/2021. (c/m w/forms 8/18/2021 - dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Magistrate Judge by Kelly M Marzullo on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. A certified copy of the transcript of the record is due in 60 days unless otherwise ordered. (c/m 8/18/2021 - dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andrew Martin Dunn(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Andrew Martin Dunn. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunn v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Martin Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kelly M Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Notify
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?