Progressive Casualty Insurance Company v. Future Van Lines, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Future Van Lines, LLC, Brandon Roseboro, Vecchio McKethean and Penske Truck Leasing Corporation
Case Number: 8:2021cv02599
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Correspondence from Counsel for Penske Truck Leasing Co. L.P. regarding appearance (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Kambon Raymond Williams on behalf of Progressive Casualty Insurance Company (Williams, Kambon)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Andrew Keder on behalf of Brandon Roseboro (Keder, Anthony)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/14/2021. (c/m to counsel on record ybs, Deputy Clerk)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Transfer Notification Letter to All Counsel (c/m 10/8/2021 ybs, Deputy Clerk)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Middle; Case Number 1:20-cv-00960. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 9/27/21, that Roseboro's Motion to Transfer Venue pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), (ECF No. #15 ), is GRANTED and the Clerk of Court shall transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Maryland. FURTHER that upon transfer of this action the proceedings in this Court shall be terminated. (Butler, Carol)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Envelope Containing #27 Clerk's Entry of Default addressed to VECCHIO MCKETHEAN, 3020 14th Street NW,Apartment 105,Washington, DC 20009 returned to court by postal service, marked undeliverable because NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED. (Hicks, Samantha)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT signed by John S. Brubaker on 04/13/2021 as to Defendants Future Van Lines, LLC and Vecchio McKethean for failure to file a claim and an answer or otherwise defend. (Garland, Leah)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Entry of Default by PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion)(MARCINAK, CASPER)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE by PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY re #24 Notice (Other) Response to Case Manager Letter (MARCINAK, CASPER)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE to Plaintiff's counsel Re: Answer due from Defendants Future Van Lines, LLC and Vecchio McKethean. (Blay, Debbie)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to VECCHIO MCKETHEAN served on 12/6/2020, answer due 12/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service of the Complaint upon Vecchio McKethean)(MARCINAK, CASPER)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and in the Alternative to Either Transfer Venue or Decline to Exercise Discretionary Jurisdiction filed by BRANDON ROSEBORO filed by PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. Replies due by 1/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Memo in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(MARCINAK, CASPER)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Motion Submitted: #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and in the Alternative to Either Transfer Venue or Decline to Exercise Discretionary Jurisdiction to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY, filed by Defendant BRANDON ROSEBORO, to Response to #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and in the Alternative to Either Transfer Venue or Decline to Exercise Discretionary Jurisdiction filed by BRANDON ROSEBORO. (MILLS, JAMES)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and in the Alternative to Either Transfer Venue or Decline to Exercise Discretionary Jurisdiction filed by BRANDON ROSEBORO filed by PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. Replies due by 1/20/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Memo in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(MARCINAK, CASPER)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 12/29/20, that the Motion for Extension of Time [Doc. #18 ] is GRANTED, and Plaintiff shall have an additional fourteen days to and including January 6, 2021, within which to serve its responsive pleading. (Butler, Carol)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Motion Referred: RE: #18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 Brief, #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and in the Alternative to Either Transfer Venue or Decline to Exercise Discretionary Jurisdiction, #17 Corrected, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Blay, Debbie)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 Brief, #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and in the Alternative to Either Transfer Venue or Decline to Exercise Discretionary Jurisdiction, #17 Corrected Document by PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (MARCINAK, CASPER)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Corrected document re #16 Brief. (MILLS, JAMES)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 BRIEF re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and in the Alternative to Either Transfer Venue or Decline to Exercise Discretionary Jurisdiction . (MILLS, JAMES)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and in the Alternative to Either Transfer Venue or Decline to Exercise Discretionary Jurisdiction by BRANDON ROSEBORO. Response to Motion due by 12/30/2020 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of J. Gaffigan, #2 Memorandum in support of motion)(MILLS, JAMES)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ***FILED IN ERROR***AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to VECCHIO MCKETHEAN served on 12/3/2020, answer due 12/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service upon Vecchio McKethean)(MARCINAK, CASPER) Modified on 12/7/2020 to mark as Filed in Error to and remove document from access. Attorney to properly re-file. (Garland, Leah).
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CORPORATION. (BERKELHAMMER, JONATHAN)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (MARCINAK, CASPER)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for BRANDON ROSEBORO. Answer due by 12/15/2020. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this text order on defendant BRANDON ROSEBORO and subsequently file a certificate of service. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 12/4/2020. (Brubaker, John)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD no longer assigned to the case. (Marsh, Keah)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, for Brandon Roseboro by Plaintiff PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (MARCINAK, CASPER)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, for Brandon Roseboro by PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (MARCINAK, CASPER)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(BERKELHAMMER, JONATHAN)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JONATHAN ARTHUR BERKELHAMMER on behalf of Defendant PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CORPORATION (BERKELHAMMER, JONATHAN)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CORPORATION. Answer due by 12/7/2020. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 11/16/2020. (Brubaker, John)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for BRANDON ROSEBORO. Answer due by 12/8/2020. Plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this text order on defendant BRANDON ROSEBORO and subsequently file a certificate of service. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 11/16/2020. (Brubaker, John)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY as to FUTURE VAN LINES, LLC served on 10/29/2020, answer due 11/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(MARCINAK, CASPER)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY as to PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CORPORATION served on 10/26/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(MARCINAK, CASPER)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PROGRESSIVE CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY as to BRANDON ROSEBORO served on 10/24/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(MARCINAK, CASPER)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Hicks, Samantha)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Hicks, Samantha)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Brandon Roseboro, #2 Summons - Vecchio McKethean, #3 Summons - Penske Truck Leasing Corporation) (Hicks, Samantha)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (MARCINAK, CASPER) (Main Document 2 replaced with flattened version on 10/20/2020) (Hicks, Samantha)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2915014.), filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(MARCINAK, CASPER)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Hicks, Samantha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company v. Future Van Lines, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kambon Raymond Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Future Van Lines, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Roseboro
Represented By: Anthony Andrew Keder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vecchio McKethean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?