Walker v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Lasharne Walker
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security and Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: SSA Notify
Case Number: 8:2021cv02603
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: J Mark Coulson
Referring Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson for pretrial management. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 10/19/2021. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
October 19, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2021 Filing 6 Decline to proceed before a Magistrate Judge (Fyock, Matthew)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 10/14/2021. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. Pursuant to Standing Order 2021-12, which can be downloaded #here, Lasharne Walker or counsel for Lasharne Walker has 30 days from the date of this notice to file their consent or declination to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent or declination, go to Civil > Correspondence > Magistrate Judge - consent/decline. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Magistrate Election Form due by 11/15/2021. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 14, 2021 Filing 3 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Magistrate Judge by Kelly M Marzullo on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. A certified copy of the transcript of the record is due on 12/13/2021 unless otherwise ordered. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lasharne Walker(Fyock, Matthew)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Lasharne Walker against Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Lasharne Walker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fyock, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lasharne Walker
Represented By: Matthew D Fyock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Kelly M Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Notify
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?