Mendoza Zelaya v. Rockville Seafood and Grill, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Marden Mendoza Zelaya
Defendant: Rockville Seafood and Grill, Inc. T/A Sadaf Halal Restaurant, Reza Ghassemi Faraji, Amirhossein Faraji and Rockville Seafood and Grill, Inc
Case Number: 8:2021cv02711
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 5/16/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 12/15/2021. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DISCOVERY ORDER with Discovery Protocols. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 12/15/2021. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 LETTER ORDER regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 12/15/2021. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 12/14/2021. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 14, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Behrman on behalf of Amirhossein Faraji, Reza Ghassemi Faraji, Rockville Seafood and Grill, Inc (Behrman, Nicole)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER striking ECF Nos. #12 , #14 for failure to comply with ECF Nos. #5 and 11 . The parties are reminded to review all orders from the Court, including ECF No. 11 , and to proceed in accordance with the same BEFORE the Court will entertain any further action in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 12/14/2021. (gp2s, Chambers)
December 13, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Reza Ghassemi Faraji, Rockville Seafood and Grill, Inc.(Cleary, Lauri)
December 13, 2021 Filing 13 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Amirhossein Faraji, Reza Ghassemi Faraji, Rockville Seafood and Grill, Inc (Cleary, Lauri)
December 13, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Amirhossein Faraji(Cleary, Lauri)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER holding in abeyance any ruling on ECF No. #10 until both parties review ECF No. 4 and proceed in accordance with the same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 11/29/2021. (bh5s, Chambers)
November 23, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Marden Mendoza Zelaya (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Consent Motion to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Amster, Michael)
November 10, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marden Mendoza Zelaya. Amirhossein Faraji served on 11/7/2021, answer due 11/29/2021.(Amster, Michael)
November 10, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marden Mendoza Zelaya. Reza Ghassemi Faraji served on 11/6/2021, answer due 11/29/2021.(Amster, Michael)
November 10, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marden Mendoza Zelaya. Rockville Seafood and Grill, Inc served on 11/6/2021, answer due 11/29/2021.(Amster, Michael)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 10/22/2021. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Marden Mendoza Zelaya or counsel for Marden Mendoza Zelaya are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 11/5/2021. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Amirhossein Faraji, Reza Ghassemi Faraji, Rockville Seafood and Grill, Inc. T/A Sadaf Halal Restaurant. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Marden Mendoza Zelaya re #1 Complaint Summons to Rockville Seafood and Grill, Inc. T/A Sadaf Halal Restaurant (Carr, Curtis)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9563560.), filed by Marden Mendoza Zelaya. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Carr, Curtis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza Zelaya v. Rockville Seafood and Grill, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marden Mendoza Zelaya
Represented By: Curtis Fennell Carr, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Kingston Amster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockville Seafood and Grill, Inc. T/A Sadaf Halal Restaurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reza Ghassemi Faraji
Represented By: Lauri Elizabeth Cleary
Represented By: Nicole Behrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amirhossein Faraji
Represented By: Lauri Elizabeth Cleary
Represented By: Nicole Behrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockville Seafood and Grill, Inc
Represented By: Lauri Elizabeth Cleary
Represented By: Nicole Behrman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?