Moon v. Veritas Technologies LLC
Plaintiff: Brendan Moon
Defendant: Veritas Technologies LLC
Case Number: 8:2021cv02750
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Seal Reply (Doc 23) by Veritas Technologies LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bass, Timothy)
December 15, 2021 Filing 23 -SEALED-REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Veritas Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - RB Plan)(Bass, Timothy)
December 15, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Redacted filed by Veritas Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Document Under Seal)(Bass, Timothy)
December 1, 2021 Filing 21 Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Koss, Natalie)
December 1, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE by Brendan Moon Filing Document Under Seal (Koss, Natalie)
December 1, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Seal by Brendan Moon (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Koss, Natalie)
December 1, 2021 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Brendan Moon. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Koss, Natalie)
November 24, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Springer on behalf of Brendan Moon (Springer, Emily)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 11/12/2021. (jw2s, Chambers)
November 10, 2021 Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Nicholas A Corsano. Directing attorney Nicholas A Corsano to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 11/10/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
November 10, 2021 Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James N Boudreau. Directing attorney James N Boudreau to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 11/10/2021. (dm4, Deputy Clerk)
November 9, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Nicholas A. Corsano (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9597771.) by Veritas Technologies LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bass, Timothy)
November 9, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James N. Boudreau (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-9597741.) by Veritas Technologies LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bass, Timothy)
November 9, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by Veritas Technologies LLC re #3 Standing Order Concerning Removal and Statement in Response (Bass, Timothy)
November 8, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Brendan Moon (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Koss, Natalie)
November 2, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Seal Exhibit A and Quoted Material from Exhibit A in Defendant's Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss by Veritas Technologies LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bass, Timothy)
November 2, 2021 Filing 8 Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bass, Timothy)
November 2, 2021 Filing 7 REDACTED DOCUMENT to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Memorandum of Law in Support by Veritas Technologies LLC (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Document Under Seal)(Bass, Timothy)
November 2, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Veritas Technologies LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bass, Timothy)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Brendan Moon (Koss, Natalie)
November 2, 2021 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Veritas Technologies LLC identifying Corporate Parent Veritas US Inc. for Veritas Technologies LLC.(Bass, Timothy)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 10/26/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
October 26, 2021 Filing 2 State Court COMPLAINT against Veritas Technologies LLC, filed by Brendan Moon.(ybs, Deputy Clerk)
October 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Maryland for Charles County, case number C-08-CV-21-000431. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9570686), filed by Veritas Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Bass, Timothy)
October 26, 2021 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR CHARLES COUNTY, MARYLAND. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moon v. Veritas Technologies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brendan Moon
Represented By: Natalie M Koss
Represented By: Emily Springer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veritas Technologies LLC
Represented By: Timothy C Bass
Represented By: James N Boudreau
Represented By: Nicholas A Corsano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?