Portillo v. H Restaurant and Night Club, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Marina Portillo
Defendant: H Restaurant and Night Club, LLC d/b/a Wheaton Lounge, RAR Group Inc. d/b/a El Tipico Dominicano, Jose Lopez, Rafael Reyes, H Restaurant and Night Club, LLC doing business as Wheaton Lounge and RAR Group Inc. doing business as El Tipico Dominicano
Case Number: 8:2021cv02894
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Referring Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marina Portillo. RAR Group Inc. served on 1/5/2022, answer due 1/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Due Diligence)(Laimeche, Marlene)
January 6, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Marina Portillo(Laimeche, Marlene)
January 3, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marina Portillo. H Restaurant and Night Club, LLC served on 12/2/2021, answer due 12/23/2021; Jose Lopez served on 12/6/2021, answer due 12/27/2021; Rafael Reyes served on 12/7/2021, answer due 12/28/2021.(Laimeche, Marlene)
November 16, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 11/12/2021. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Marina Portillo or counsel for Marina Portillo are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 11/29/2021. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to H Restaurant and Night Club, LLC, Jose Lopez, RAR Group Inc., Rafael Reyes.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Omitting Plaintiff's Home Address by Marina Portillo (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Plaintiff)(Laimeche, Marlene)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9601192.), filed by Marina Portillo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons H Restaurant and Night Club, LLC d/b/a Wheaton Lounge, #3 Summons RAR Group Inc. d/b/a El Tipico Dominicano, #4 Summons Jose Lopez, #5 Summons Rafael Reyes)(Laimeche, Marlene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Portillo v. H Restaurant and Night Club, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marina Portillo
Represented By: Cori M Cohen
Represented By: Marlene Ailloud Laimeche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H Restaurant and Night Club, LLC d/b/a Wheaton Lounge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAR Group Inc. d/b/a El Tipico Dominicano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H Restaurant and Night Club, LLC doing business as Wheaton Lounge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAR Group Inc. doing business as El Tipico Dominicano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?