Lexon Insurance Company v. Miller et al
Plaintiff: LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: MARQUITH MILLER, FARGO EXPRESS, LLC, 11 TRANSPORT USA LLC, 7-STARS EQUIPMENTS LLC, ADR TRANSPORTATION LLC, ALBION EXPRESS INC, ALIVE FREE TRANSPORTATION LLC, ALL SPECIALIZED INC, ANDERSON & SON TRUCKING LLC, ANDREW MAPENZI SANGA D/B/A SANGA TRANSPORT, ANTONIO CHAVEZ SALAZAR D/B/A A C TRUCKING, AR TRUCK LINES INC, AX EXPRESS INC, B LINE TRANSPORT CORP, BAE LOGISTICS LLC, BEEMAC, INC D/B/A BEEMAC TRUCKING, BERLIN TRANSPORTATION, LLC, BEST RATE XPRESS LLC D/B/A J.B. WEST TRUCKING & CO., BLUE WAY LOGISTICS INC., BRIAN S. DESSAUER D/B/A SCOTT DESSAUER TRUCKING, BRIGHT STAR TRUCKING INC, BROOMFIELD TRANSPORT LLC, CHAMOUSS DINE OBA DINE D/B/A CHAMS TRANSPORT, CONQUEROR TRANS LLC, CONTINENTAL BULLET, INC, COPELAND TRUCKING INC, CTT LLC, D & C ASSETS LLC, DAVIDSON'S EXPRESS TRUCKING LLC, DBTL LLC, DTX TRANS INC, DUO TRANSPORT INC, E & L MORALES TRANSPORTATION INC, EBENEZER INTEGRATED LOGISTICS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, EFRAIN MURO D/B/A A & R TRANSPORTATION, ELB46 TRANSPORTATION INC, EMESS EXPRESS INC, EVANS EXPEDITE LLC, EVOLUTION TRANSPORT INC, FERNANDO DEL TORO QUINTANA, FINNEMAN INDUSTRIES L.L.C., FIVE STAR TRUCKING INC, FLATBED DISPATCH INC, FOUR HORSEMEN EXPRESS LLC, FRONTIER EXPRESS INC, FTS DELIVERY, INC., GARY E HUNTER, GAVIO TRANSPORTATION LLC, GEAUXE FREIGHT LLC D/B/A GEAUXE FREIGHT, GEORGE FREIGHT SOLUTIONS LLC, GEORGIA BOYZ TRUCKING OF LAKE OCONEE GA. LLC, GOLDEN CLAW TRANZ INC., GOOD NEWS TRUCKING CORPORATION D/B/A GOOD NEWS CARRIER, GREGORIO LAZARO D/B/A LAZARO'S TRUCKING, GULFSTREAM LOGISTICS, INC., GXL GROUP INC, HERMES TRANS INC, HOWARD M. BAKER D/B/A H.M.B. TRUCKING, HUDDLESTON TRANSPORT LLC, IKAAR CORP, ISIDRO P. CARRILLO D/B/A IPC TRUCKING, J&V TRANSPORT SERVICES LLC, JAR HOTSHOT SERVICES LLC, JUBILANT TRANSPORTATION INC, JULIAN G. VAQUERA, KAMAZ SERVICES INC, KATIO, INC., KEEP ON TRUCKIN' LLC, KELLY & DULCY BYER D/B/A BYER TRANSPORT, KOVAL TRUCKING LLC, KRANAWETTER TRANSPORT LLC, LAL TRANSPORT INC, LANDHAWK CARRIERS INC, LARA LOGISTICS L L C, LEO FREIGHT LLC, LEOBARDO MENDOZA D/B/A MENDOZA TRUCKING, LOAD TO RIDE TRANSPORTATION LLC, LOWBOY SERVICES INC, LUIS GUADALUPE ROSETE D/B/A LUIS G ROSETE TRANSPORT, MAG CARRIERS LLC, MANNING ENTERPRISES, INC. D/B/A T. MANNING ENTERPRISES, MATRIX LOGISTICS INC, MAXIMUM SPEED TRANSPORTATION INC, MIDWEST TRANSPORT LLC, MISSOURI BOULDER RETAINING WALL CO, MOISES DELGADO D/B/A DELTRANSPORT, MOLERIO LINE HAUL INC, MOON BOYS TRUCKING LLC, MORO TRANSPORT LLC, MOTHERS TRANSPORTATION LLC, MOUNTAIN RANGE SUPPLY, LLC, MR. FROGS TRUCKING LLC, N & G EXPRESS FL LLC, NIGHTHAWK LOGISTICS INC, NOVA LINES INC, OD EXPRESS INC, ONE-WAY LA INC, OSCAR N. ROVIRA D/B/A ROVIRA TRUCKING, OSEI P BANAHENE D/B/A BANAHENE TRUCKING, OVERFLOW TRANSPORTATION L.L.C., PINKERTON TRANSPORTATION LLC, PLUS CARGO LLC, R A ORTEGA TRUCKING INC, R&R EXPRESS LLC, RAYON OF GOD INC, RNDY TRANSPORT INC, ROADFLEET CARRIER SERVICES INC, ROCKY R TRANSPORT LLC, ROUND TRIP LOGISTICS INC, RUN DIRECT INC., SAFE TRUCKING LLC, SAMPA & SONS TRANSPORT CORP, SAVA EXPRESS INC, SCHEIRON TRANSPORTATION INC, SDJ TRUCKING LLC, SEVEN M LOGISTICS LLC D/B/A SEVEN M LOGISTICS, SHOUSHA TRUCKING, LLC, SLIMS TRUCKING LLC, SOURCE N SHIP IT LLC, STAN KOCH & SONS TRUCKING, INC., SUMMIT TRUCKING LOGISTICS LLC, TASHA SOMMEROUR D/B/A SOMMEROUR TRUCKING CO, THROTTLE OUT TRANSPORT LLC, TIGER TRANSPORT GROUP INC, TITAN TRANSPORTATION LLC, TL TRANSPORT LLC, TRAIN INC, TRANSPORTERS TRANSPORT, LLC D/B/A HOFFMAN TRANSPORTATION, TREVER GUILBEAU CONSULTING LLC, TRI-COAST CARRIERS, L.L.C., TROPICAL TRANSPORTATION LLC, TRP EXPRESS LLC, TRUCKING ENTERPRISE INC, US PRIDE INC, VAN INC, VH-EXPRESS LLC D/B/A VH-EXPRESS, VOCI INC, WE WIKE TRUCKING INC, WESTERN SKY TRUCKING INC, WESTEX GOING TRUCKING LLC, YMLL LLC, Albion Express LLC, Andrew Mapenzi Sanga doing business as Sanga Transport, Antonio Chavez Salazar doing business as A C Trucking, Beemac, Inc doing business as Beemac Trucking, Best Rate Xpress LLC doing business as J.B. West Trucking & Co., Brian S. Dessauer doing business as Scott Dessauer Trucking, Chamouss Dine Oba Dine doing business as Chams Transport, Ebenezer Intregrated Logistics Limited Liability Company, Efrain Muro doing business as A & R Transportation, Geauxe Freight LLC doing business as Geauxe Freight, Good News Trucking Corporation doing business as Good News Carrier, Gregorio Lazario doing business as Lazaro's Trucking, Howard M. Baker doing business as H.M.B. Trucking, Ikarr Corp, Isidro P. Carrillo doing business as IPC Trucking, Jar Hotspot Services LLC, Kelly & Dulcy Byer doing business as Byer Transport, Lara Logistics LLC, Leobardo Mendoza doing business as Mendoza Trucking, Luis Guadalupe Rosete doing business as Luis G Rosete Transport, Manning Enterprises, Inc. doing business as Manning Enterprises, Moises Delgado doing business as Deltransport, Mountain Range Supple, LLC, Oscar N. Rovira doing business as Rovira Trucking, Osei P Banahene doing business as Banahene Trucking, Seven M Logistics LLC doing business as Seven M Logistics, Stan Koch & Son's Trucking, Inc., Tasha Sommerour doing business as Sommerour Trucking Co, Transporters Transport, LLC doing business as Hoffman Transportation, VH-Express LLC doing business as VH-Express and White Mountain Trucking, LLC
Case Number: 8:2021cv02897
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paul W Grimm
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Filing 65 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Julian G. Vaquera, Voci Inc, Western Sky Trucking Inc.(Kurz, James)
December 22, 2021 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by James Steward Kurz on behalf of AR Truck Lines Inc, Alive Free Transportation LLC, Howard M. Baker, Conqueror Trans LLC, DTX Trans Inc, Emess Express Inc, Frontier Express Inc, GXL Group Inc, Landhawk Carriers Inc, MAG Carriers LLC, Roadfleet Carrier Services Inc, Shousha Trucking, LLC, Source N Ship It LLC, Trever Guilbeau Consulting LLC, Julian G. Vaquera, Voci Inc, Western Sky Trucking Inc (Kurz, James)
December 21, 2021 Filing 63 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Moises Delgado waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
December 17, 2021 Filing 62 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. YMLL LLC waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
December 17, 2021 Filing 61 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Osei P Banahene waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
December 16, 2021 Filing 60 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Brian S. Dessauer waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
December 16, 2021 Filing 59 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Bright Star Trucking Inc waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
December 16, 2021 Filing 58 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Davidson's Express Trucking LLC waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
December 16, 2021 Filing 57 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Efrain Muro served on 11/12/2021, answer due 12/3/2021.(Cox, Jeffrey)
December 16, 2021 Filing 56 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Gregorio Lazario waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
December 16, 2021 Filing 55 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Huddleston Transport LLC waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
December 16, 2021 Filing 54 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Jubilant Transportation Inc waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
December 16, 2021 Filing 53 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Manning Enterprises, Inc. waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
December 16, 2021 Filing 52 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Tasha Sommerour waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
December 16, 2021 Filing 51 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Throttle Out Transport LLC waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
December 10, 2021 Filing 50 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Fernando Del Toro Quintana waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
December 9, 2021 Filing 49 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Nova Lines Inc waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
December 9, 2021 Filing 48 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Beemac, Inc waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
December 9, 2021 Filing 47 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Summit Trucking Logistics LLC waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
December 3, 2021 Filing 46 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Evolution Transport Inc waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
December 2, 2021 Filing 45 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Copeland Trucking Inc waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
December 2, 2021 Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Safe Trucking LLC waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
December 2, 2021 Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. FTS Delivery, Inc. waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
December 2, 2021 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Rayon of God Inc waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
December 2, 2021 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Moro Transport LLC waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
December 2, 2021 Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Trever Guilbeau Consulting LLC waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
December 2, 2021 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Frontier Express Inc waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
December 2, 2021 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. E & L Morales Transportation Inc waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
December 2, 2021 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Tiger Transport Group Inc waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
December 2, 2021 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Blue Way Logistics Inc. waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
December 2, 2021 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Anderson & Son Trucking LLC waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
December 1, 2021 Filing 34 AMENDED COMPLAINT against 11 Transport USA LLC, 7-Stars Equipments LLC, ADR Transportation LLC, AR Truck Lines Inc, Albion Express LLC, Alive Free Transportation LLC, All Specialized Inc, Anderson & Son Trucking LLC, Andrew Mapenzi Sanga, Ax Express Inc, B Line Transport Corp, Bae Logistics LLC, Howard M. Baker, Osei P Banahene, Beemac, Inc, Berlin Transportation, LLC, Best Rate Xpress LLC, Blue Way Logistics Inc., Bright Star Trucking Inc, Broomfield Transport LLC, CTT LLC, Isidro P. Carrillo, Chamouss Dine Oba Dine, Antonio Chavez Salazar, Conqueror Trans LLC, Continental Bullet, Inc, Copeland Trucking Inc, D & C Assets LLC, DBTL LLC, DTX Trans Inc, Davidson's Express Trucking LLC, Moises Delgado, Brian S. Dessauer, Duo Transport Inc, E & L Morales Transportation Inc, ELB46 Transportation Inc, Ebenezer Intregrated Logistics Limited Liability Company, Emess Express Inc, Evans Expedite LLC, Evolution Transport Inc, FTS Delivery, Inc., Fargo Express, LLC, Finneman Industries L.L.C., Five Star Trucking Inc, Flatbed Dispatch Inc, Four Horsemen Express LLC, Frontier Express Inc, GXL Group Inc, Gavio Transportation LLC, Geauxe Freight LLC, George Freight Solutions LLC, Georgia Boyz Trucking of Lake Oconee GA. LLC, Golden Claw Tranz Inc., Good News Trucking Corporation, Gulfstream Logistics, Inc., Hermes Trans Inc, Huddleston Transport LLC, Gary E Hunter, Ikarr Corp, J&V Transport Services LLC, Jar Hotspot Services LLC, Jubilant Transportation Inc, Kamaz Services Inc, Katio, Inc., Keep on Truckin' LLC, Kelly & Dulcy Byer, Koval Trucking LLC, Kranawetter Transport LLC, LAL Transport Inc, Landhawk Carriers Inc, Lara Logistics LLC, Gregorio Lazario, Leo Freight LLC, Load to Ride Transportation LLC, Lowboy Services Inc, MAG Carriers LLC, Manning Enterprises, Inc., Matrix Logistics Inc, Maximum Speed Transportation Inc, Leobardo Mendoza, Midwest Transport LLC, Marquith Miller, Missouri Boulder Retaining Wall Co, Molerio Line Haul Inc, Moon Boys Trucking LLC, Moro Transport LLC, Mothers Transportation LLC, Mountain Range Supple, LLC, Mr. Frogs Trucking LLC, Efrain Muro, N & G Express FL LLC, Nighthawk Logistics Inc, Nova Lines Inc, OD Express Inc, One-Way LA Inc, Overflow Transportation L.L.C., Pinkerton Transportation LLC, Plus Cargo LLC, Fernando Del Toro Quintana, R A Ortega Trucking Inc, R&R Express LLC, Rayon of God Inc, Rndy Transport Inc, Roadfleet Carrier Services Inc, Rocky R Transport LLC, Luis Guadalupe Rosete, Round Trip Logistics Inc, Oscar N. Rovira, Run Direct Inc., SDJ Trucking LLC, Safe Trucking LLC, Sampa & Sons Transport Corp, Sava Express Inc, Scheiron Transportation Inc, Seven M Logistics LLC, Shousha Trucking, LLC, Slims Trucking LLC, Tasha Sommerour, Source N Ship It LLC, Stan Koch & Son's Trucking, Inc., Summit Trucking Logistics LLC, TL Transport LLC, TRP Express LLC, Throttle Out Transport LLC, Tiger Transport Group Inc, Titan Transportation LLC, Train Inc, Transporters Transport, LLC, Trever Guilbeau Consulting LLC, Tri-Coast Carriers, L.L.C., Tropical Transportation LLC, Trucking Enterprise Inc, US Pride Inc, VH-Express LLC, Van Inc, Julian G. Vaquera, Voci Inc, We Wike Trucking Inc, Western Sky Trucking Inc, Westex Going Trucking LLC, YMLL LLC, White Mountain Trucking, LLC, filed by Lexon Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1-Redlined Complaint, #2 Appendix A - General Agreement of Indemnity)(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 29, 2021 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Best Rate Xpress LLC waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 29, 2021 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Finneman Industries L.L.C. waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 29, 2021 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Leo Freight LLC waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 23, 2021 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Matrix Logistics Inc waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 23, 2021 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Good News Trucking Corporation waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 23, 2021 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Ebenezer Intregrated Logistics Limited Liability Company waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 23, 2021 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Luis Guadalupe Rosete waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 23, 2021 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Plus Cargo LLC waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 23, 2021 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Mountain Range Supple, LLC waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 23, 2021 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. OD Express Inc waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2021 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Albion Express LLC waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2021 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. CTT LLC waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2021 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Duo Transport Inc waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2021 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. ELB46 Transportation Inc waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Gary E Hunter waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2021 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Golden Claw Tranz Inc. waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Ikarr Corp waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. J&V Transport Services LLC waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Jar Hotspot Services LLC waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Slims Trucking LLC waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Stan Koch & Son's Trucking, Inc. waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Conqueror Trans LLC waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Lowboy Services Inc waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Geauxe Freight LLC waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Flatbed Dispatch Inc waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 18, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Trucking Enterprise Inc waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Hermes Trans Inc waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 18, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. GXL Group Inc waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Continental Bullet, Inc waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 16, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lexon Insurance Company. Load to Ride Transportation LLC waiver sent on 11/12/2021, answer due 1/11/2022.(Cox, Jeffrey)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LETTER ORDER regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/15/2021. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Lexon Insurance Company was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons for each Defendant. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 Complaint. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER, INDEMNITY, AND POSTING OF COLLATERAL against 11 TRANSPORT USA LLC, 7-STARS EQUIPMENTS LLC, ADR TRANSPORTATION LLC, ALBION EXPRESS INC, ALIVE FREE TRANSPORTATION LLC, ALL SPECIALIZED INC, ANDERSON & SON TRUCKING LLC, ANDREW MAPENZI SANGA D/B/A SANGA TRANSPORT, ANTONIO CHAVEZ SALAZAR D/B/A A C TRUCKING, AR TRUCK LINES INC, AX EXPRESS INC, B LINE TRANSPORT CORP, BAE LOGISTICS LLC, BEEMAC, INC D/B/A BEEMAC TRUCKING, BERLIN TRANSPORTATION, LLC, BEST RATE XPRESS LLC D/B/A J.B. WEST TRUCKING & CO., BLUE WAY LOGISTICS INC., BRIAN S. DESSAUER D/B/A SCOTT DESSAUER TRUCKING, BRIGHT STAR TRUCKING INC, BROOMFIELD TRANSPORT LLC, CHAMOUSS DINE OBA DINE D/B/A CHAMS TRANSPORT, CONQUEROR TRANS LLC, CONTINENTAL BULLET, INC, COPELAND TRUCKING INC, CTT LLC, D & C ASSETS LLC, DAVIDSON'S EXPRESS TRUCKING LLC, DBTL LLC, DTX TRANS INC, DUO TRANSPORT INC, E & L MORALES TRANSPORTATION INC, EBENEZER INTEGRATED LOGISTICS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, EFRAIN MURO D/B/A A & R TRANSPORTATION, ELB46 TRANSPORTATION INC, EMESS EXPRESS INC, EVANS EXPEDITE LLC, EVOLUTION TRANSPORT INC, FARGO EXPRESS, LLC, FERNANDO DEL TORO QUINTANA, FINNEMAN INDUSTRIES L.L.C., FIVE STAR TRUCKING INC, FLATBED DISPATCH INC, FOUR HORSEMEN EXPRESS LLC, FRONTIER EXPRESS INC, FTS DELIVERY, INC., GARY E HUNTER, GAVIO TRANSPORTATION LLC, GEAUXE FREIGHT LLC D/B/A GEAUXE FREIGHT, GEORGE FREIGHT SOLUTIONS LLC, GEORGIA BOYZ TRUCKING OF LAKE OCONEE GA. LLC, GOLDEN CLAW TRANZ INC., GOOD NEWS TRUCKING CORPORATION D/B/A GOOD NEWS CARRIER, GREGORIO LAZARO D/B/A LAZARO'S TRUCKING, GULFSTREAM LOGISTICS, INC., GXL GROUP INC, HERMES TRANS INC, HOWARD M. BAKER D/B/A H.M.B. TRUCKING, HUDDLESTON TRANSPORT LLC, IKAAR CORP, ISIDRO P. CARRILLO D/B/A IPC TRUCKING, J&V TRANSPORT SERVICES LLC, JAR HOTSHOT SERVICES LLC, JUBILANT TRANSPORTATION INC, JULIAN G. VAQUERA, KAMAZ SERVICES INC, KATIO, INC., KEEP ON TRUCKIN' LLC, KELLY & DULCY BYER D/B/A BYER TRANSPORT, KOVAL TRUCKING LLC, KRANAWETTER TRANSPORT LLC, LAL TRANSPORT INC, LANDHAWK CARRIERS INC, LARA LOGISTICS L L C, LEO FREIGHT LLC, LEOBARDO MENDOZA D/B/A MENDOZA TRUCKING, LOAD TO RIDE TRANSPORTATION LLC, LOWBOY SERVICES INC, LUIS GUADALUPE ROSETE D/B/A LUIS G ROSETE TRANSPORT, MAG CARRIERS LLC, MANNING ENTERPRISES, INC. D/B/A T. MANNING ENTERPRISES, MATRIX LOGISTICS INC, MAXIMUM SPEED TRANSPORTATION INC, MIDWEST TRANSPORT LLC, MARQUITH MILLER, MISSOURI BOULDER RETAINING WALL CO, MOISES DELGADO D/B/A DELTRANSPORT, MOLERIO LINE HAUL INC, MOON BOYS TRUCKING LLC, MORO TRANSPORT LLC, MOTHERS TRANSPORTATION LLC, MOUNTAIN RANGE SUPPLY, LLC, MR. FROGS TRUCKING LLC, N & G EXPRESS FL LLC, NIGHTHAWK LOGISTICS INC, NOVA LINES INC, OD EXPRESS INC, ONE-WAY LA INC, OSCAR N. ROVIRA D/B/A ROVIRA TRUCKING, OSEI P BANAHENE D/B/A BANAHENE TRUCKING, OVERFLOW TRANSPORTATION L.L.C., PINKERTON TRANSPORTATION LLC, PLUS CARGO LLC, R A ORTEGA TRUCKING INC, R&R EXPRESS LLC, RAYON OF GOD INC, RNDY TRANSPORT INC, ROADFLEET CARRIER SERVICES INC, ROCKY R TRANSPORT LLC, ROUND TRIP LOGISTICS INC, RUN DIRECT INC., SAFE TRUCKING LLC, SAMPA & SONS TRANSPORT CORP, SAVA EXPRESS INC, SCHEIRON TRANSPORTATION INC, SDJ TRUCKING LLC, SEVEN M LOGISTICS LLC D/B/A SEVEN M LOGISTICS, SHOUSHA TRUCKING, LLC, SLIMS TRUCKING LLC, SOURCE N SHIP IT LLC, STAN KOCH & SONS TRUCKING, INC., SUMMIT TRUCKING LOGISTICS LLC, TASHA SOMMEROUR D/B/A SOMMEROUR TRUCKING CO, THROTTLE OUT TRANSPORT LLC, TIGER TRANSPORT GROUP INC, TITAN TRANSPORTATION LLC, TL TRANSPORT LLC, TRAIN INC, TRANSPORTERS TRANSPORT, LLC D/B/A HOFFMAN TRANSPORTATION, TREVER GUILBEAU CONSULTING LLC, TRI-COAST CARRIERS, L.L.C., TROPICAL TRANSPORTATION LLC, TRP EXPRESS LLC, TRUCKING ENTERPRISE INC, US PRIDE INC, VAN INC, VH-EXPRESS LLC D/B/A VH-EXPRESS, VOCI INC, WE WIKE TRUCKING INC, WESTERN SKY TRUCKING INC, WESTEX GOING TRUCKING LLC, YMLL LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9601645.), filed by LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-General Agreement of Indemnity, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cox, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lexon Insurance Company v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jeffrey Ellison Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARQUITH MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FARGO EXPRESS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 11 TRANSPORT USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7-STARS EQUIPMENTS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADR TRANSPORTATION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBION EXPRESS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALIVE FREE TRANSPORTATION LLC
Represented By: James Steward Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL SPECIALIZED INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDERSON & SON TRUCKING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW MAPENZI SANGA D/B/A SANGA TRANSPORT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTONIO CHAVEZ SALAZAR D/B/A A C TRUCKING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AR TRUCK LINES INC
Represented By: James Steward Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AX EXPRESS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B LINE TRANSPORT CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAE LOGISTICS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEEMAC, INC D/B/A BEEMAC TRUCKING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERLIN TRANSPORTATION, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEST RATE XPRESS LLC D/B/A J.B. WEST TRUCKING & CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLUE WAY LOGISTICS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN S. DESSAUER D/B/A SCOTT DESSAUER TRUCKING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIGHT STAR TRUCKING INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROOMFIELD TRANSPORT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAMOUSS DINE OBA DINE D/B/A CHAMS TRANSPORT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONQUEROR TRANS LLC
Represented By: James Steward Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONTINENTAL BULLET, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COPELAND TRUCKING INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D & C ASSETS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVIDSON'S EXPRESS TRUCKING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DBTL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DTX TRANS INC
Represented By: James Steward Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUO TRANSPORT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E & L MORALES TRANSPORTATION INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EBENEZER INTEGRATED LOGISTICS LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EFRAIN MURO D/B/A A & R TRANSPORTATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELB46 TRANSPORTATION INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMESS EXPRESS INC
Represented By: James Steward Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVANS EXPEDITE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVOLUTION TRANSPORT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FERNANDO DEL TORO QUINTANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FINNEMAN INDUSTRIES L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIVE STAR TRUCKING INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLATBED DISPATCH INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOUR HORSEMEN EXPRESS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRONTIER EXPRESS INC
Represented By: James Steward Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FTS DELIVERY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY E HUNTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAVIO TRANSPORTATION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEAUXE FREIGHT LLC D/B/A GEAUXE FREIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE FREIGHT SOLUTIONS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGIA BOYZ TRUCKING OF LAKE OCONEE GA. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOLDEN CLAW TRANZ INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOOD NEWS TRUCKING CORPORATION D/B/A GOOD NEWS CARRIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORIO LAZARO D/B/A LAZARO'S TRUCKING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GULFSTREAM LOGISTICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GXL GROUP INC
Represented By: James Steward Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERMES TRANS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWARD M. BAKER D/B/A H.M.B. TRUCKING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUDDLESTON TRANSPORT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IKAAR CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISIDRO P. CARRILLO D/B/A IPC TRUCKING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&V TRANSPORT SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAR HOTSHOT SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUBILANT TRANSPORTATION INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIAN G. VAQUERA
Represented By: James Steward Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAMAZ SERVICES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATIO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEEP ON TRUCKIN' LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY & DULCY BYER D/B/A BYER TRANSPORT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOVAL TRUCKING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRANAWETTER TRANSPORT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAL TRANSPORT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LANDHAWK CARRIERS INC
Represented By: James Steward Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARA LOGISTICS L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEO FREIGHT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEOBARDO MENDOZA D/B/A MENDOZA TRUCKING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOAD TO RIDE TRANSPORTATION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOWBOY SERVICES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUIS GUADALUPE ROSETE D/B/A LUIS G ROSETE TRANSPORT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAG CARRIERS LLC
Represented By: James Steward Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANNING ENTERPRISES, INC. D/B/A T. MANNING ENTERPRISES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATRIX LOGISTICS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAXIMUM SPEED TRANSPORTATION INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDWEST TRANSPORT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MISSOURI BOULDER RETAINING WALL CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOISES DELGADO D/B/A DELTRANSPORT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOLERIO LINE HAUL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOON BOYS TRUCKING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORO TRANSPORT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOTHERS TRANSPORTATION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOUNTAIN RANGE SUPPLY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. FROGS TRUCKING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N & G EXPRESS FL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIGHTHAWK LOGISTICS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOVA LINES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OD EXPRESS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONE-WAY LA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OSCAR N. ROVIRA D/B/A ROVIRA TRUCKING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OSEI P BANAHENE D/B/A BANAHENE TRUCKING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OVERFLOW TRANSPORTATION L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PINKERTON TRANSPORTATION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLUS CARGO LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R A ORTEGA TRUCKING INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&R EXPRESS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAYON OF GOD INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RNDY TRANSPORT INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROADFLEET CARRIER SERVICES INC
Represented By: James Steward Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCKY R TRANSPORT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROUND TRIP LOGISTICS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUN DIRECT INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAFE TRUCKING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMPA & SONS TRANSPORT CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAVA EXPRESS INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHEIRON TRANSPORTATION INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SDJ TRUCKING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEVEN M LOGISTICS LLC D/B/A SEVEN M LOGISTICS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHOUSHA TRUCKING, LLC
Represented By: James Steward Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLIMS TRUCKING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOURCE N SHIP IT LLC
Represented By: James Steward Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STAN KOCH & SONS TRUCKING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUMMIT TRUCKING LOGISTICS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TASHA SOMMEROUR D/B/A SOMMEROUR TRUCKING CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THROTTLE OUT TRANSPORT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIGER TRANSPORT GROUP INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TITAN TRANSPORTATION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TL TRANSPORT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAIN INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANSPORTERS TRANSPORT, LLC D/B/A HOFFMAN TRANSPORTATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TREVER GUILBEAU CONSULTING LLC
Represented By: James Steward Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRI-COAST CARRIERS, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TROPICAL TRANSPORTATION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRP EXPRESS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRUCKING ENTERPRISE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US PRIDE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VAN INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VH-EXPRESS LLC D/B/A VH-EXPRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VOCI INC
Represented By: James Steward Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WE WIKE TRUCKING INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTERN SKY TRUCKING INC
Represented By: James Steward Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTEX GOING TRUCKING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YMLL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albion Express LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Mapenzi Sanga doing business as Sanga Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Chavez Salazar doing business as A C Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beemac, Inc doing business as Beemac Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Rate Xpress LLC doing business as J.B. West Trucking & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian S. Dessauer doing business as Scott Dessauer Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chamouss Dine Oba Dine doing business as Chams Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ebenezer Intregrated Logistics Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Efrain Muro doing business as A & R Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geauxe Freight LLC doing business as Geauxe Freight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good News Trucking Corporation doing business as Good News Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregorio Lazario doing business as Lazaro's Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard M. Baker doing business as H.M.B. Trucking
Represented By: James Steward Kurz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ikarr Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isidro P. Carrillo doing business as IPC Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jar Hotspot Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly & Dulcy Byer doing business as Byer Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lara Logistics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leobardo Mendoza doing business as Mendoza Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Guadalupe Rosete doing business as Luis G Rosete Transport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manning Enterprises, Inc. doing business as Manning Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moises Delgado doing business as Deltransport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Range Supple, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscar N. Rovira doing business as Rovira Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osei P Banahene doing business as Banahene Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seven M Logistics LLC doing business as Seven M Logistics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan Koch & Son's Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tasha Sommerour doing business as Sommerour Trucking Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transporters Transport, LLC doing business as Hoffman Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VH-Express LLC doing business as VH-Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Mountain Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?