Gabriel, LLC v. PMG Mid Atlantic, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gabriel llc and Gabriel, LLC
Defendant: PMG Mid Atlantic, LLC, Petroleum Marketing Group, Inc. and Prince George's County
Case Number: 8:2021cv02961
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Filing 18 Amended MOTION to Remand by Gabriel, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service)(Maloney, Timothy)
January 14, 2022 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Prince Georges County on 10/30/2021, filed by Gabriel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS Certified Return Receipt)(Maloney, Timothy)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jillyn K Schulze for Mediation. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 1/6/2022. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER directing parties to meet and confer to discuss the proposed Motion to Remand and setting a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 1/5/2022. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
January 5, 2022 Filing 14 Case Management Conference held on 1/5/2022 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang.(Court Reporter: FTR Recording\2B) (ds2s, Deputy Clerk)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying without prejudice #12 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 12/20/2021. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike by Gabriel, LLC(Maloney, Timothy)
December 14, 2021 Filing 11 PAPERLESS NOTICE. A RULE 16 CONFERENCE is scheduled for January 5, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. To join the call at the scheduled time: (1) Dial 1-888-557-8511. (2) Enter access code 3008173, followed by the # key. You will then be placed on hold until Chambers dials into the call, at which point you will be prompted to enter a security code. (3) When prompted, enter security code 01051000 followed by the # key. The call will be recorded, so please do not use speakerphones as they compromise sound quality. Also, we ask that parties not remain on the conference line after the Judge has left the call, to ensure that the line is free for other calls that may be on the Judge's calendar. The parties are reminded that they should be prepared to address whether they consent to have all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge and whether they wish to participate in a mediation session with a Magistrate Judge, whether before, during, or after discovery. Parties are expected to consult with their clients and confer with each other on these issues in advance of the Rule 16 Case Management Conference and, if possible, present joint views to the Court. (ds2s, Deputy Clerk)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 4/28/2022.. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 12/14/2021. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
December 7, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by PMG Mid Atlantic, LLC, Petroleum Marketing Group, Inc..(Schwager, Stuart)
November 30, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by PMG Mid Atlantic, LLC, Petroleum Marketing Group, Inc. re #5 Notice of Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions Statement Regarding Removal (Schwager, Stuart)
November 30, 2021 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by PMG Mid Atlantic, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Petroleum Marketing Group, Corporate Parent NSR Investments, LLC, Corporate Parent PMG MA Investors, LLC for PMG Mid Atlantic, LLC.(Schwager, Stuart)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 11/19/2021. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE regarding #1 Notice of Removal by PMG Mid Atlantic, LLC, Petroleum Marketing Group, Inc. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against PMG Mid Atlantic, LLC, Petroleum Marketing Group, Inc., filed by Gabriel llc.(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, Maryland, case number CAL21-11709. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9614029), filed by PMG Mid Atlantic, LLC, Petroleum Marketing Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit State Court Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit State Court Line Entering Appearance, #5 Exhibit State Court Line Requesting Summons, #6 Exhibit State Court Online Docket Printout, #7 Exhibit Notice of Notice of Removal)(Schwager, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gabriel, LLC v. PMG Mid Atlantic, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel llc
Represented By: Timothy Francis Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Francis Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMG Mid Atlantic, LLC
Represented By: Stuart Alan Schwager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petroleum Marketing Group, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart Alan Schwager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prince George's County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?