Balsam v. Ching-Hwei Yu LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carrie M Balsam
Defendant: Ching-Hwei Yu LLC and Michelle Yu
Case Number: 8:2022cv00277
Filed: February 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Referring Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2022 Filing 21 AMENDED ANSWER to by Ching-Hwei Yu LLC, Michelle Yu. (Attachments: #1 Mark-up to Answer)(Decker, Suzzanne)
March 16, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Marie Duckett on behalf of Ching-Hwei Yu LLC, Michelle Yu (Duckett, Tyler)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Request Modification of Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/15/2022. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2022 Filing 18 Case Management Conference held on 3/15/2022 before Judge Theodore D. Chuang.(Court Reporter: FTR Recording\2B) (ds2s, Deputy Clerk)
March 11, 2022 Filing 17 Joint MOTION re #14 Scheduling Order REQUEST FOR MODIFICATION OF SCHEDULING ORDER by Ching-Hwei Yu LLC, Michelle Yu(Decker, Suzzanne)
March 7, 2022 Filing 16 PAPERLESS NOTICE. A RULE 16 CONFERENCE is scheduled for March 15, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. To join the call at the scheduled time: (1) Dial 1-888-557-8511. (2) Enter access code 3008173, followed by the # key. You will then be placed on hold until Chambers dials into the call, at which point you will be prompted to enter a security code. (3) When prompted, enter security code 03151100 followed by the # key. The call will be recorded, so please do not use speakerphones as they compromise sound quality. Also, we ask that parties not remain on the conference line after the Judge has left the call, to ensure that the line is free for other calls that may be on the Judge's calendar. The parties are reminded that they should be prepared to address whether they consent to have all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge and whether they wish to participate in a mediation session with a Magistrate Judge, whether before, during, or after discovery. Parties are expected to consult with their clients and confer with each other on these issues in advance of the Rule 16 Case Management Conference and, if possible, present joint views to the Court. (ds2s, Deputy Clerk)
March 2, 2022 Filing 15 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Ching-Hwei Yu LLC (Decker, Suzzanne)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 7/15/2022. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/2/2022. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
March 1, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford Scott Bernstein on behalf of All Defendants (Bernstein, Bradford)
March 1, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzzanne W Decker on behalf of Ching-Hwei Yu LLC, Michelle Yu (Decker, Suzzanne)
March 1, 2022 Filing 11 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Ching-Hwei Yu LLC, Michelle Yu.(Decker, Suzzanne)
February 28, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carrie M Balsam. Carrie M Balsam served on 2/8/2022, answer due 3/1/2022.(Burgoon, Stephen)
February 28, 2022 Filing 9 QC NOTICE: #8 Affidavit of Service filed by Carrie M Balsam was filed incorrectly. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. ***Please refile using the event Summons Returned Executed so that the answer due date is automatically populated into the docket text. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2022 Filing 8 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint and Case Management Order served on Counsel to Defendants on 02/08/2022, filed by Carrie M Balsam.(Burgoon, Stephen) Modified on 2/28/2022 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 2/16/2022. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 2/3/2022. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 3, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Carrie M Balsam or counsel for Carrie M Balsam are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 2/17/2022. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 3, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Ching-Hwei Yu LLC, Michelle Yu.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 2, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE by Carrie M Balsam of Summons for Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons Proposed Summons)(Burgoon, Stephen)
February 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ching-Hwei Yu LLC and Michelle Yu ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9731957.), filed by Carrie M Balsam. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burgoon, Stephen) Modified on 2/2/2022 (heps, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balsam v. Ching-Hwei Yu LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie M Balsam
Represented By: Stephen Samuel Burgoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ching-Hwei Yu LLC
Represented By: Bradford Scott Bernstein
Represented By: Suzzanne W Decker
Represented By: Tyler Marie Duckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Yu
Represented By: Bradford Scott Bernstein
Represented By: Suzzanne W Decker
Represented By: Tyler Marie Duckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?