Phillips v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Tyree Phillips
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: SSA Notify
Case Number: 8:2022cv00296
Filed: February 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: J Mark Coulson
Referring Judge: Brendan Abell Hurson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2022 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Brendan Abell Hurson. Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 2/7/2022. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 2/4/2022. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 4, 2022 Filing 4 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Magistrate Judge by Kelly M Marzullo on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. A certified copy of the transcript of the record is due on 4/5/2022 unless otherwise ordered. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 3, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tyree Phillips(Shea, Stephen)
February 3, 2022 Filing 2 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Shea, Stephen)
February 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by Tyree Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shea, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyree Phillips
Represented By: Stephen F Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Kelly M Marzullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Notify
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?