Mendez Cervantes et al v. Panel and Window Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mynor Mendez Cervantes, Emilio Antonio Leiva Torres, Dairin Dagoberto Funez Rosales, Edwin Ezequias Lopez Villagrez, Beto Mendez and Jose Fernando Romero Arango
Defendant: Panel and Window Services LLC, Josue Cabrera, Debra's Glass, INC, Barton-Malow Company and Barton Malow Builders LLC
Case Number: 8:2022cv00337
Filed: February 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Referring Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Consent Motion to Vacate the Court's March 24, 2022 Order of Default as to Defendant Debra's Glass, Inc. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 4/4/2022. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
March 31, 2022 Filing 25 Consent MOTION to Set Aside Default by Debra's Glass, INC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nichols, Jackson)
March 30, 2022 Filing 24 RESPONSE re #23 Order, filed by Mynor Mendez Cervantes.(Melehy, Omar)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER directing Plaintiffs to file and serve on Barton Malow Builders LLC and Barton-Malow Company Motions for Clerk's Entry of Default within Fourteen (14) days of this Order or show cause as to why such motions would be inappropriate. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 3/30/2022. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
March 24, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Panel and Window Services LLC (c/m 3/24/2022 heps, Deputy Clerk)
March 24, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Debra's Glass, INC (c/m 3/24/2022 heps, Deputy Clerk)
March 24, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Josue Cabrera (c/m 3/24/2022 heps, Deputy Clerk)
March 24, 2022 Filing 19 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Josue Cabrera, Debra's Glass, INC, Panel and Window Services LLC (heps, Deputy Clerk)
March 16, 2022 Filing 18 Supplement (Amended Certificate of Service) to #15 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense as to Defendant Debra's Glass, Inc. filed by Mynor Mendez Cervantes (Melehy, Omar) Modified on 3/17/2022 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
March 16, 2022 Filing 17 Supplement (Amended Certificate of Service) to #14 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense as to Defendant Panel and Window Services LLC filed by Mynor Mendez Cervantes (Melehy, Omar) Modified on 3/17/2022 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
March 16, 2022 Filing 16 Supplement (Amended Certificate of Service) to #13 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense as to Defendant Josue Cabrera filed by Mynor Mendez Cervantes (Melehy, Omar) Modified on 3/17/2022 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
March 14, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense as to Defendant Debra's Glass, Inc. by Mynor Mendez Cervantes(Melehy, Omar)
March 14, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense as to Defendant Panel and Window Services LLC by Mynor Mendez Cervantes(Melehy, Omar)
March 14, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense as to Defendant Josue Cabrera by Mynor Mendez Cervantes(Melehy, Omar)
February 25, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mynor Mendez Cervantes. Barton-Malow Company served on 2/22/2022, answer due 3/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Green Card from Certified Mail)(Melehy, Omar)
February 23, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mynor Mendez Cervantes. Josue Cabrera served on 2/18/2022, answer due 3/11/2022.(Melehy, Omar)
February 23, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mynor Mendez Cervantes. Panel and Window Services LLC served on 2/18/2022, answer due 3/11/2022.(Melehy, Omar)
February 23, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mynor Mendez Cervantes. Barton Malow Builders LLC served on 2/18/2022, answer due 3/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Green Card from Certified Mail)(Melehy, Omar)
February 23, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mynor Mendez Cervantes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Green Card from Certified Mail)(Melehy, Omar)
February 23, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mynor Mendez Cervantes. Debra's Glass, INC served on 2/18/2022, answer due 3/11/2022.(Melehy, Omar)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 2/10/2022. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 2/9/2022. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 9, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Dairin Dagoberto Funez Rosales, Emilio Antonio Leiva Torres, Edwin Ezequias Lopez Villagrez, Beto Mendez, Mynor Mendez Cervantes, Jose Fernando Romero Arango or counsel for Dairin Dagoberto Funez Rosales, Emilio Antonio Leiva Torres, Edwin Ezequias Lopez Villagrez, Beto Mendez, Mynor Mendez Cervantes, Jose Fernando Romero Arango are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 2/23/2022. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 9, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Barton Malow Builders LLC, Barton-Malow Company, Josue Cabrera, Debra's Glass, INC, Panel and Window Services LLC.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 9, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
February 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9742379.), filed by Mynor Mendez Cervantes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons As to Panel and Window Services LLC, #3 Summons As to Josue Cabrera, #4 Summons As to Debra's Glass, INC, #5 Summons As to Barton-Malow Company, #6 Summons As to Barton Malow Builders LLC)(Melehy, Omar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez Cervantes et al v. Panel and Window Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mynor Mendez Cervantes
Represented By: Omar Vincent Melehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emilio Antonio Leiva Torres
Represented By: Omar Vincent Melehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dairin Dagoberto Funez Rosales
Represented By: Omar Vincent Melehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Ezequias Lopez Villagrez
Represented By: Omar Vincent Melehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beto Mendez
Represented By: Omar Vincent Melehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Fernando Romero Arango
Represented By: Omar Vincent Melehy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panel and Window Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josue Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra's Glass, INC
Represented By: Jackson S. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barton-Malow Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barton Malow Builders LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?