Wilson v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Katrina Wilson
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: SSA Notify
Case Number: 8:2022cv00353
Filed: February 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: J Mark Coulson
Referring Judge: Brendan Abell Hurson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2022 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Brendan Abell Hurson. Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 2/16/2022. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
February 11, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kilolo Kijakazi(Melanson, Theodore)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 2/10/2022. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2022 Filing 5 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Magistrate Judge by Kelly M Marzullo on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. A certified copy of the transcript of the record is due within 60 days unless otherwise ordered. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2022 Filing 4 QC NOTICE: #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Katrina Wilson was filed incorrectly. **The document pages are not upside up. Please re-file the motion with the pages in the corrected format. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
February 10, 2022 Filing 3 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Murahari, Arjun)
February 10, 2022 Filing 2 [FILED IN ERROR] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Katrina Wilson(Murahari, Arjun) Modified on 2/10/2022 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk).
February 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, filed by Katrina Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murahari, Arjun)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Wilson
Represented By: Arjun Kuncham Murahari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Kelly M Marzullo
Represented By: Theodore Anthony Melanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Notify
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?