Lee v. Prince George County Public School et al
Plaintiff: LaSheik Lee
Defendant: Prince George County Public School, Board of Education Prince George's County, Dr. Monica Goldson, CEO and Superintendent Trinell Bowman
Case Number: 8:2022cv00957
Filed: April 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1400 IDEA: Individuals With Disabilities Education Act (short title)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Prince George County Public School(Krew, Jeffrey)
June 9, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Lamar Pryor Howard on behalf of LaSheik Lee (Howard, Keith)
June 9, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Board of Education Prince George's County.(Krew, Jeffrey)
June 8, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LaSheik Lee. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Harvey, Stephenson)
May 27, 2022 Filing 11 QC NOTICE: #10 Summons Returned Executed, filed by LaSheik Lee was filed incorrectly. **A motion to Seal and supporting memorandum must be filed separately before filing summons under seal. The motion should be filed as the main document and the supporting memorandum as a separate attachment to the main document. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2022 Filing 10 (FILED IN ERROR) -SEALED- SUMMONS Returned Executed by LaSheik Lee. Board of Education Prince George's County served on 4/28/2022, answer due 5/19/2022; Monica Goldson, CEO served on 4/28/2022, answer due 5/19/2022; Prince George County Public School served on 4/28/2022, answer due 5/19/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Harvey, Stephenson) Modified on 5/27/2022 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
May 24, 2022 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Monica Goldson, CEO (Krew, Jeffrey)
May 23, 2022 Filing 8 QC NOTICE: #7 Financial Affidavit filed by Trinell Bowman was filed incorrectly. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. Wrong Event selected, please resubmit your documents using the correct event Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement (heps, Deputy Clerk)
May 19, 2022 Filing 7 (FILED IN ERROR) FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Trinell Bowman(Krew, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/23/2022 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
May 18, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Monica Goldson, CEO.(Krew, Jeffrey)
May 5, 2022 Administrative Record Filed on 5/5/2022 by Plaintiff LaSheik Lee. (Placed in the clerk's Office) (heps, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/24/2022 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
April 20, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Board of Education Prince George's County, Trinell Bowman, Monica Goldson, CEO, Prince George County Public School.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
April 20, 2022 Filing 4 Correspondence re: summons (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Harvey, Stephenson)
April 20, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Correspondence re: civil cover sheet (Harvey, Stephenson)
April 19, 2022 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by LaSheik Lee (Harvey, Stephenson)
April 19, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-9885631.), filed by LaSheik Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Harvey, Stephenson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Prince George County Public School et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaSheik Lee
Represented By: Stephenson Harvey, Jr
Represented By: Keith Lamar Pryor Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prince George County Public School
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education Prince George's County
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Monica Goldson, CEO
Represented By: Jeffrey A Krew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent Trinell Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?