Elite Protective Services, Inc. v. International Guards Union of America, Local 154
Plaintiff: Elite Protective Services, Inc.
Defendant: International Guards Union of America, Local 154
Case Number: 8:2022cv00974
Filed: April 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Timothy J Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0010 Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #8 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 5/6/2022. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing Elite Protective Services, Inc. to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2019-07. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/24/2022 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Elite Protective Services, Inc. files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 5/6/2022. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 6, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #6 Consent/Decline to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Elite Protective Services, Inc. must correct the following error(s):**Pursuant to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures, consent/declination forms are to be filed with the event 25 Pct Mag Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge OR 25 Pct Mag Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, both located in Other Filings >Other Documents. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 5, 2022 Filing 6 [FILED IN ERROR] Consent to Magistrate Judge (Floyd, Robert) Modified on 5/6/2022 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk).
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 4/21/2022. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 21, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Elite Protective Services, Inc. or counsel for Elite Protective Services, Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/5/2022. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 21, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to International Guards Union of America, Local 154.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
April 21, 2022 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Elite Protective Services, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Guardian Security Training Academy, Inc. for Elite Protective Services, Inc..(Floyd, Robert)
April 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against International Guards Union of America, Local 154 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-9888882.), filed by Elite Protective Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Summons)(Floyd, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elite Protective Services, Inc. v. International Guards Union of America, Local 154
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elite Protective Services, Inc.
Represented By: Rene Sandler
Represented By: Robert P Floyd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Guards Union of America, Local 154
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?