Elite Protective Services, Inc. v. International Guards Union of America, Local 154
Plaintiff: Elite Protective Services, Inc.
Defendant: International Guards Union of America, Local 154
Case Number: 8:2022cv01126
Filed: May 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Paula Xinis
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elite Protective Services, Inc.. International Guards Union of America, Local 154 served on 6/24/2022, answer due 7/15/2022.(Floyd, Robert)
May 10, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to International Guards Union of America, Local 154.(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2022 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Elite Protective Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Guardian Security Training Academy, Inc. for Elite Protective Services, Inc..(Floyd, Robert)
May 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against International Guards Union of America, Local 154 ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-9923544.), filed by Elite Protective Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Summons)(Floyd, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elite Protective Services, Inc. v. International Guards Union of America, Local 154
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elite Protective Services, Inc.
Represented By: Robert P Floyd, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Guards Union of America, Local 154
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?