JTH Tax LLC v. Dillard et al
Plaintiff: JTH Tax LLC doing business as Liberty Tax Service formerly known as JTH Tax Inc. and JTH Tax Inc.
Defendant: Signature Taxx, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Lorenzo Dillard, Shannon Dillard and Infinity Investment Group, Inc.
Counter Defendant: JTH Tax LLC
Case Number: 8:2022cv01677
Filed: July 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2022 Filing 15 Request for Conference (Barnes, Jonathan)
August 2, 2022 Filing 14 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Signature Taxx, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Signature Taxx, Inc..(Leite, Kendra)
August 2, 2022 Filing 13 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Infinity Investment Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Infinity Investment Group, Inc..(Leite, Kendra)
August 2, 2022 Filing 12 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, Lorenzo Dillard, Shannon Dillard, and Signature Taxx, Inc.'s, COUNTERCLAIM against JTH Tax LLC by Signature Taxx, Inc., Shannon Dillard, Lorenzo Dillard, Infinity Investment Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Counterclaim)(Leite, Kendra)
July 15, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JTH Tax LLC. Signature Taxx, Inc. served on 7/12/2022, answer due 8/2/2022.(Barnes, Jonathan)
July 15, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JTH Tax LLC. Infinity Investment Group, Inc. served on 7/12/2022, answer due 8/2/2022.(Barnes, Jonathan)
July 15, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JTH Tax LLC. Shannon Dillard served on 7/12/2022, answer due 8/2/2022.(Barnes, Jonathan)
July 15, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JTH Tax LLC. Lorenzo Dillard served on 7/12/2022, answer due 8/2/2022.(Barnes, Jonathan)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 7/8/2022. (ybs, Deputy Clerk)
July 7, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 7, 2022 Filing 6 Supplement to #1 Complaint,, filed by JTH Tax LLC Verification Page to Verified Complaint for Injunctive Relief and Damages (Barnes, Jonathan)
July 7, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Lorenzo Dillard, Shannon Dillard, Infinity Investment Group, Inc., Signature Taxx, Inc..(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
July 7, 2022 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by JTH Tax LLC identifying Corporate Parent JTH Tax LLC d/b/a Liberty Tax Service, Corporate Parent Franchise Group Intermediate L 2, LLC, Corporate Parent Franchise Group Intermediate L 1, LLC, Corporate Parent Franchise Group Intermediate L, LLC, Corporate Parent Franchise Group New Holdco, LLC, Corporate Parent Franchise Group, Inc., Corporate Parent B. Riley Financial Group for JTH Tax LLC.(Barnes, Jonathan)
July 7, 2022 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by JTH Tax LLC was filed incorrectly. **All corporate parents and/or affiliates should be added at the time of filing. Please refile and add all corporate parents and/or affiliates when prompted by the system. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
July 7, 2022 Filing 2 [FILED IN ERROR] Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by JTH Tax LLC d/b/a Liberty Tax Service f/k/a JTH Tax, Inc. (Barnes, Jonathan) Modified on 7/7/2022 (kk5s, Deputy Clerk).
July 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint for Injunction Relief and Damages against Lorenzo Dillard, Shannon Dillard, Infinity Investment Group, Inc., Singature Taxx, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10036600.), filed by JTH Tax LLC d/b/a Liberty Tax Service f/k/a JTH Tax, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Summons Lorenzo Dillard, #10 Summons Shannon Dillard, #11 Summons Infinity Investment Group, Inc., #12 Summons Signature Taxx, Inc.)(Barnes, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JTH Tax LLC v. Dillard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JTH Tax LLC doing business as Liberty Tax Service formerly known as JTH Tax Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Anthony Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JTH Tax Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Anthony Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Lorenzo Dillard
Represented By: Kendra Marie Leite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Shannon Dillard
Represented By: Kendra Marie Leite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Infinity Investment Group, Inc.
Represented By: Kendra Marie Leite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signature Taxx, Inc.
Represented By: Kendra Marie Leite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: JTH Tax LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Anthony Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?