Venero et al v. Prince George's County Maryland et al
Plaintiff: Denise Venero, Sophia Venero and Stephany Venero
Defendant: Prince George's County Maryland, Edward L. Jefferson, Terri LittleJohn, Tanya Roberts, Jacob Cooke and Does 1-10
Case Number: 8:2022cv01805
Filed: July 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER staying this case for 30 days; parties shall have a Second Settlement Conference on 10/6/2022 at 2:00 p.m.; postponing the Injunction and TRO Hearing and shall be rescheduled if the parties are unable to reach a settlement in this matter. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 8/30/2022. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Joint MOTION to Stay re #20 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #19 Emergency MOTION to Intervene , #23 Affidavit, #18 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, Settlement Conference, #22 Affidavit by Jacob Cooke, Does 1-10, Edward L. Jefferson, Terri LittleJohn, Prince George's County Maryland, Tanya Roberts (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Elizabeth)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Settlement Conference held on 8/29/2022 before Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi. (babs, Chambers)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Denise Venero, Sophia Venero, Stephany Venero.(Rosenthal, Richard) Modified on 8/29/2022 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk).
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT re #20 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Denise Venero, Sophia Venero, Stephany Venero(Rosenthal, Richard)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT re #19 Emergency MOTION to Intervene by Denise Venero, Sophia Venero, Stephany Venero(Rosenthal, Richard)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE by Jacob Cooke, Does 1-10, Edward L. Jefferson, Terri LittleJohn, Prince George's County Maryland, Tanya Roberts re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Line Appending Exhibit A (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Administrative Order)(Adams, Elizabeth)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Denise Venero, Sophia Venero, Stephany Venero (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Emergency TRO Motion, #2 Affidavit Ex. A - Pena Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order re: Emergency TRO)(Rosenthal, Richard)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Emergency MOTION to Intervene by Denise Venero, Sophia Venero, Stephany Venero (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Emergency Motion to Intervene, #2 Text of Proposed Order for Emergency Motion to Intervene, #3 Exhibit A - PG Proud Affidavit, #4 Exhibit B - Ray Declaration, #5 Exhibit C - Pena Declaration, #6 Exhibit D - Doe Declaration, #7 Exhibit E - Doe Declaration, #8 Exhibit F - Doe Declaration, #9 Exhibit G - Curran Declaration, #10 Exhibit H - Doe Declaration)(Rosenthal, Richard)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 8/25/2022. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 LETTER ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for Monday August 29, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 8/24/2022. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Settlement Conference by Denise Venero, Sophia Venero, Stephany Venero (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Re: Motion for Settlement Conference)(Rosenthal, Richard)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Jacob Cooke, Does 1-10, Edward L. Jefferson, Terri LittleJohn, Prince George's County Maryland, Tanya Roberts (Adams, Elizabeth)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jacob Cooke, Does 1-10, Edward L. Jefferson, Terri LittleJohn, Prince George's County Maryland, Tanya Roberts (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, Elizabeth)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #10 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order; parties shall submit briefing in accordance with the schedule set by the Court during the 8/8/2022 hearing; scheduling an in-person Preliminary Injunction Hearing on 8/30/2022 at 2:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 8/12/2022. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Lynn Adams on behalf of All Defendants (Adams, Elizabeth)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Motion Hearing held on 8/9/2022 re #10 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiffs - Argued - DENIED for the reasons stated on the record by Judge George Jarrod Hazel. (Court Reporter: Renee Ewing - via ZoomGov) (tds, Deputy Clerk)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Denise Venero, Sophia Venero, Stephany Venero (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for TRO, #2 Affidavit Denise Venero, #3 Affidavit Rebekah Lusk, #4 Exhibit A - Signed Breed Evaluation, #5 Exhibit B - Activity Report, #6 Exhibit C - Notice of Hearing, #7 Exhibit D - Text Message, #8 Exhibit E - Amended Notice of Violation, #9 Exhibit F - Letter from Attorney Lusk, #10 Exhibit G - Letter from Attorney Lusk, #11 Exhibit H - Emails btwn Att. Lusk and County Attorney, #12 Exhibit I - Memorandum Defs attempted to coerce upon Plaintiff, #13 Exhibit J - Civil Penalty Citations, #14 Exhibit K - Civil Penalty Receipts, #15 Exhibit L - Breed Indentification Poster, #16 Exhibit M - Accommodation Emails, #17 Exhibit N - Accommodation Letter, #18 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenthal, Richard)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE by Denise Venero, Sophia Venero, Stephany Venero re #7 Amended Complaint,, Red Lined (Rosenthal, Richard)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 QC NOTICE: #7 Amended Complaint,, filed by Denise Venero, Stephany Venero, Sophia Venero needs to be corrected. The following corrective actions are needed regarding missing or incomplete information: **Redline copy has not been filed. Please file the Redline version using the event Notice (Other) and link it to #7 . (dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sophia Venero, Stephany Venero, Denise Venero. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Verification of Denise Venero, #2 Affidavit Verification of Stephany Venero, #3 Affidavit Verification of Sophia Venero, #4 Exhibit A - Notice of Violation, #5 Exhibit B - Notice of Hearing, #6 Exhibit C - Letter from Attorney Lusk, #7 Exhibit D - Letter from Attorney Lusk II, #8 Exhibit E - Amended Notice of Violation, #9 Exhibit F - Signed Breed Evaluation, #10 Exhibit G - Accommodation Letter and ESA Medical Letter)(Rosenthal, Richard)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (FILED IN ERROR) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sophia Venero, Stephany Venero, Denise Venero. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Verification of Denise Venero, #2 Affidavit Verification of Stephany Venero, #3 Affidavit Verification of Sophia Venero, #4 Exhibit A - Notice of Violation, #5 Exhibit B - Notice of Hearing, #6 Exhibit C - Letter from Attorney Lusk, #7 Exhibit D - Letter from Attorney Lusk, #8 Exhibit E - Amended Notice of Violation, #9 Exhibit F - Signed Breed Evaluation, #10 Exhibit G - Reasonable Accommodation Request)(Rosenthal, Richard) Modified on 8/3/2022 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sophia Venero, Stephany Venero, Denise Venero. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Return of Summons, #2 Summons Return of Summons, #3 Summons Return of Summons, #4 Summons Return of Summons)(Rosenthal, Richard)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TRO Hearing held on 7/22/2022 ECF #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunction - Argued - Moot; Prince George's County to release the animals once they determine where outside the County they will be kenneled pending a hearing on August 10, 2022; Parties to submit a Proposed Order to the Court; before Judge George Jarrod Hazel.(Court Reporter: Marlene Kerr - via ZoomGov) (dhs, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Jacob Cooke, Edward L. Jefferson, Terri LittleJohn, Prince George's County Maryland, Tanya Roberts.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Denise Venero, Sophia Venero, Stephany Venero (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support TRO Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A - Notice of Violation, #3 Exhibit B - Jefferson Email, #4 Exhibit C - Commission Hearings, #5 Exhibit D - Pictures of Modified Gate, #6 Affidavit Plaintiff Denise Venero, #7 Affidavit Plaintiff Sophia Venero, #8 Affidavit Plaintiff Stephany Venero, #9 Affidavit Huth Declaration of Service, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rosenthal, Richard)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10064031.), filed by Denise Venero, Sophia Venero, Stephany Venero. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Def Cooke Summons, #3 Summons Def. Jefferson Summons, #4 Summons Def. Littlejohn Summons, #5 Summons Def - Prince George's County Summons, #6 Summons Def - Roberts Summons, #7 Exhibit A - Notice of Violation)(Rosenthal, Richard)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (heps, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Venero et al v. Prince George's County Maryland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Venero
Represented By: Richard Bruce Rosenthal
Represented By: Rebekah Damen Lusk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia Venero
Represented By: Richard Bruce Rosenthal
Represented By: Rebekah Damen Lusk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephany Venero
Represented By: Richard Bruce Rosenthal
Represented By: Rebekah Damen Lusk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prince George's County Maryland
Represented By: Elizabeth Lynn Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward L. Jefferson
Represented By: Elizabeth Lynn Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri LittleJohn
Represented By: Elizabeth Lynn Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Roberts
Represented By: Elizabeth Lynn Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Cooke
Represented By: Elizabeth Lynn Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Represented By: Elizabeth Lynn Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?