Cohn et al v. Baye et al
Plaintiff: Edward S. Cohn, Stephen N. Goldberg, Richard E. Solomon, Richard J. Rogers, Michael McKeefery and Christianna Kersey
Defendant: Asegdech Amare Baye and Asegedech A. Baye
Intervenor Plaintiff: MTGLQ Investors LP
Case Number: 8:2022cv02106
Filed: August 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Theodore D Chuang
Referring Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444 Notice of Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2022 Filing 19 Remand Letter from the Clerk to the Circuit Court for Charles County, Maryland. (c/m 10/12/2022 heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER directing the Clerk to Remand this case to the Circuit Court for Charles County, Maryland. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 10/12/2022. (c/m to Prose Defendants on 10/12/2022 heps, Deputy Clerk)
October 6, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand to State Court by MTGLQ Investors LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Circuit Ct Dkt., #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Deed, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 SDAT Registration)(Hillman, Robert)
October 6, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Intervene as party Plaintiff by MTGLQ Investors LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Motion for Remand, #2 Exhibit Motion Exhibit 1 Circuit Ct Dkt, #3 Exhibit Motion Exhibit 2 Deed, #4 Exhibit Motion Exhibit 3 SDAT Registration, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hillman, Robert)
October 6, 2022 Filing 15 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by MTGLQ Investors LP (Hillman, Robert)
October 6, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert H Hillman on behalf of MTGLQ Investors LP (Hillman, Robert)
October 3, 2022 Documents submitted via EDSS. Asegdech Amare Baye consents to receive notice and service electronically. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #12 to Show Cause Order filed by Asegdech Amare Baye.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing the Defendant show cause as to why removal was proper. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 9/16/2022. (c/m 9/16/22 bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 8, 2022 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Edward S. Cohn, Stephen N. Goldberg, Christianna Kersey, Michael McKeefery, Richard J. Rogers, Richard E. Solomon (McKeefery, Michael)
September 7, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Theodore D. Chuang. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (bljs, Chambers)
August 25, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #8 Consent/Decline to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Edward S. Cohn, Stephen N. Goldberg, Christianna Kersey, Michael McKeefery, Richard J. Rogers, Richard E. Solomon must correct the following error(s):**Pursuant to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures, consent/declination forms are to be filed with the event 25 Pct Mag Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge OR 25 Pct Mag Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, both located in Other Filings >Other Documents. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2022 Filing 8 (FILED IN ERROR) Consent to Magistrate Judge (McKeefery, Michael) Modified on 8/25/2022 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
August 24, 2022 Filing 7 Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (c/m to Prose defendants on 8/24/2022 heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 8/24/2022. (c/m to Prose Defendants on 8/24/2022 heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Edward S. Cohn, Stephen N. Goldberg, Christianna Kersey, Michael McKeefery, Richard J. Rogers, Richard E. Solomon or counsel for Edward S. Cohn, Stephen N. Goldberg, Christianna Kersey, Michael McKeefery, Richard J. Rogers, Richard E. Solomon are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/7/2022. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 24, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Asegdech Amare Baye, Asegedech A. Baye or counsel for Asegdech Amare Baye, Asegedech A. Baye are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/7/2022. (Forms c/m to Pro-se Defendants on 8/24/2022 heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING re #1 Notice of Removal, by Asegdech Amare Baye, Asegedech A. Baye. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2022 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Asegdech Amare Baye, Asegedech A. Baye, filed by Michael McKeefery, Stephen N. Goldberg, Christianna Kersey, Edward S. Cohn, Richard E. Solomon, Richard J. Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Docket Sheet)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Charles County, Maryland, case number C-08-CV-19-000869. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 292), filed by Asegedech A. Baye, Asegdech Amare Baye. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2022 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR CHARLES COUNTY. (heps, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohn et al v. Baye et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward S. Cohn
Represented By: Christianna Josepha Kersey
Represented By: Michael Joseph McKeefery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen N. Goldberg
Represented By: Christianna Josepha Kersey
Represented By: Michael Joseph McKeefery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard E. Solomon
Represented By: Christianna Josepha Kersey
Represented By: Michael Joseph McKeefery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J. Rogers
Represented By: Christianna Josepha Kersey
Represented By: Michael Joseph McKeefery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McKeefery
Represented By: Christianna Josepha Kersey
Represented By: Michael Joseph McKeefery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christianna Kersey
Represented By: Christianna Josepha Kersey
Represented By: Michael Joseph McKeefery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asegdech Amare Baye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asegedech A. Baye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: MTGLQ Investors LP
Represented By: Robert H Hillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?