W.G./Welch Mechanical Contractors, LLC v. International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Local Union 100-Sheet Metal Division
Plaintiff: WG/Welch Mechanical Contractors, LLC
Defendant: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Local Union 100-Sheet Metal Division, Richard Labille, III, Charles Sewell, David Goetzke and International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Local Union 100-Sheet Metal Division
Case Number: 8:2022cv02296
Filed: September 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Referring Judge: Gina L Simms
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #16 consent motion for extension of time. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's complaint is now due by December 16, 2022. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 11/2/2022. (Chasanow, Deborah)
November 2, 2022 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by David Goetzke, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Local Union 100-Sheet Metal Division, Richard Labille, III, Charles Sewell (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Aubrey, Lucas)
November 2, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas Robert Jason Aubrey on behalf of All Defendants (Aubrey, Lucas)
November 1, 2022 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Local Union 100-Sheet Metal Division (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Aubrey, Lucas)
November 1, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas Robert Jason Aubrey on behalf of International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Local Union 100-Sheet Metal Division (Aubrey, Lucas)
November 1, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WG/Welch Mechanical Contractors, LLC. Richard Labille, III served on 10/19/2022, answer due 11/9/2022.(Jones, Lisa)
November 1, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WG/Welch Mechanical Contractors, LLC. Charles Sewell served on 10/19/2022, answer due 11/9/2022.(Jones, Lisa)
November 1, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WG/Welch Mechanical Contractors, LLC. David Goetzke served on 10/19/2022, answer due 11/9/2022.(Jones, Lisa)
November 1, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WG/Welch Mechanical Contractors, LLC. International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Local Union 100-Sheet Metal Division served on 10/19/2022, answer due 11/9/2022.(Jones, Lisa)
October 6, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. Cromer on behalf of WG/Welch Mechanical Contractors, LLC (Cromer, Richard)
September 29, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 21, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued 21 days as to David Goetzke, International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Local Union 100-Sheet Metal Division, Richard Labille, III, Charles Sewell.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 16, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by WG/Welch Mechanical Contractors, LLC re #1 Complaint Proposed Summons (Toprani, Steven)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 9/14/2022. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. WG/Welch Mechanical Contractors, LLC or counsel for WG/Welch Mechanical Contractors, LLC are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/28/2022. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 14, 2022 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by WG/Welch Mechanical Contractors, LLC was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Summons. To correct this problem, file Proposed Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Summons to #1 Complaint. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Local 100 Sheet Meta ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10147975.), filed by W.G./Welch Mechanical Contractors, LLC.(Toprani, Steven)
September 12, 2022 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms. (kns, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: W.G./Welch Mechanical Contractors, LLC v. International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Local Union 100-Sheet Metal Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WG/Welch Mechanical Contractors, LLC
Represented By: Steven Matthew Toprani, Topra
Represented By: Richard J. Cromer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local Union 100-Sheet Metal Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Labille, III
Represented By: Lucas Robert Jason Aubrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Sewell
Represented By: Lucas Robert Jason Aubrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Goetzke
Represented By: Lucas Robert Jason Aubrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Local Union 100-Sheet Metal Division
Represented By: Lucas Robert Jason Aubrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?