Barmby v. Ourisman Chevrolet Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: John Scott Barmby
Defendant: Ourisman Chevrolet Co., Inc. doing business as Chevrolet Marlow Heights, Ourisman Imports Inc. doing business as Ourisman Mitsubishi of Marlow Heights, H Street Management LLC, Christopher Ourisman and H Street LLC
Case Number: 8:2022cv02312
Filed: September 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah L. Boardman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1715 Class Action Fairness Act of 2005
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 11/2/2022. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 1, 2022 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by John Scott Barmby(Markovitz, Brian)
October 21, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of John Scott Barmby's Claims and To Dismiss or Stay the Litigation by H Street LLC, Christopher Ourisman, Ourisman Chevrolet Co., Inc., Ourisman Imports Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(McGee, Emmett)
October 7, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Scott Barmby. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Markovitz, Brian)
September 29, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued 21 days as to H Street LLC.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 28, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John Scott Barmby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline Document, #2 Summons)(Shinnar, Michal)
September 28, 2022 Filing 5 QC NOTICE: #3 Amended Complaint filed by John Scott Barmby and #4 Amended Complaint filed by John Scott Barmby needs to be corrected. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. The following corrective actions are needed regarding missing or incomplete information: **Redline copy has not been filed. Please re-file the clean version of the amended complaint as the main document and the redline version as an attachment to the amended complaint. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2022 Filing 4 (FILED IN ERROR) AMENDED COMPLAINT against H Street Management LLC, Christopher Ourisman, Ourisman Chevrolet Co., Inc., Ourisman Imports Inc., filed by John Scott Barmby. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Shinnar, Michal) Modified on 9/28/2022 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
September 26, 2022 Filing 3 (FILED IN ERROR) AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Scott Barmby, filed by John Scott Barmby. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Shinnar, Michal) Modified on 9/28/2022 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
September 13, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to H Street Management LLC, Christopher Ourisman, Ourisman Chevrolet Co., Inc., Ourisman Imports Inc..(mg3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Deborah L. Boardman. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10149327.), filed by John Scott Barmby. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Markovitz, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barmby v. Ourisman Chevrolet Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Scott Barmby
Represented By: Brian Joseph Markovitz
Represented By: Michal Shinnar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ourisman Chevrolet Co., Inc. doing business as Chevrolet Marlow Heights
Represented By: Emmett F McGee, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ourisman Imports Inc. doing business as Ourisman Mitsubishi of Marlow Heights
Represented By: Emmett F McGee, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H Street Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Ourisman
Represented By: Emmett F McGee, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H Street LLC
Represented By: Emmett F McGee, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?